Gray et al v. Nathan Heida LLC et al
Plaintiff: Tiffany Gray, Tiffany Toth, Sandra Valencia, Lina Posada, Jessica Nichole Rockwell, Monica Leigh Burkhardt, Irina Voronina, Katarina Van Derham, Carissa Rosario, Gallienne Nabila and Anya Monzikova Fritts
Defendant: Nathan Heida LLC an Arizona limited liability company doing business as Alement, Nathan K Heida, Unknown Heida and Lane Heida (per doc.
Case Number: 2:2025cv00207
Filed: January 23, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Douglas L Rayes
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. § 1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2025 Filing 20 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY'S CHANGE OF ADDRESS/EMAIL/FIRM NAME by Amy Wilkins Hoffman. (Hoffman, Amy)
March 18, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Pursuant to Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, a Scheduling Conference is set for May 27, 2025 at 10:00 a.m. (Arizona time). The Court anticipates this hearing to be held via Zoom. The parties are directed to meet and confer at least 14 calendar days before the Scheduling Conference as required by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). At this Rule 26(f) Meeting, the parties shall develop a joint proposed Discovery Plan which contains the following information in separately numbered paragraphs...The parties shall jointly file the Plan with the Clerk (e-file the Plan using the Other Documents category and use the drop-down event Report re: Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting) not less than seven calendar days before the Scheduling Conference (absent extraordinary circumstances, no extensions of time will be granted). See document for complete details. Signed by Senior Judge Douglas L Rayes on 3/17/2025. (KLG)
March 18, 2025 Filing 18 NOTICE of Filing - AO 120 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Patent or Trademark AO 121 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Copyright filed by Nathan Heida LLC, Nathan K Heida, Unknown Heida. (Stone, Erik)
March 18, 2025 Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER: Supplemental Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. An answer, amended complaint, or other pleading #15 has been filed that may include additional trademarks, patents, or copyrights allegedly violated that were not previously included. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that may need to be completed by the party who filed the above document.If your recently filed pleading adds or changes information related to the original patents, trademarks, or copyright allegations, please complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms. Within seven (7) days, you must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form.If there are no changes to the copyright, trademark, or patent information previously submitted for this case, then the party who filed the above document must file a Notice, within seven (7) days, indicating such using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. (REK)
March 17, 2025 Filing 16 Disclosure Statement by Nathan Heida LLC. (Stone, Erik)
March 17, 2025 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Nathan Heida LLC, Nathan K Heida, Unknown Heida.(Stone, Erik)
February 24, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED granting the parties' #11 Joint Motion to Extend Deadline for Defendants to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. The deadline for Defendants Nathan K Heida, Unknown Heida, and Nathan Heida LLC to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint shall be 3/17/2025. Ordered by Senior Judge Douglas L Rayes on 2/24/2025. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MMO)
February 24, 2025 Filing 13 NOTICE re: Certificate of Service by Jessica Nichole Rockwell, Monica Leigh Burkhardt, Irina Voronina, Tiffany Gray, Katarina Van Derham, Carissa Rosario, Gallienne Nabila, Anya Monzikova Fritts, Sandra Valencia, Lina Posada re: #6 Order re Rule 12(b) Motions, . (Golaszewski, John)
February 24, 2025 Filing 12 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Jessica Nichole Rockwell, Monica Leigh Burkhardt, Irina Voronina, Tiffany Gray, Katarina Van Derham, Carissa Rosario, Gallienne Nabila, Anya Monzikova Fritts, Sandra Valencia, Lina Posada: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 02/24/2025 to Nathan K. Heida . (Golaszewski, John)
February 24, 2025 Filing 11 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Nathan Heida LLC, Nathan K Heida, Unknown Heida. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order proposed Order granting Joint Motion to Extend Deadline for Defendants to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint)(Stone, Erik)
February 24, 2025 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Erik John Stone on behalf of Nathan Heida LLC, Nathan K Heida, Unknown Heida. (Stone, Erik)
February 20, 2025 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY'S CHANGE OF ADDRESS/EMAIL/FIRM NAME by John V Golaszewski. (Golaszewski, John)
February 18, 2025 Filing 8 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Jessica Nichole Rockwell, Monica Leigh Burkhardt, Irina Voronina, Tiffany Gray, Katarina Van Derham, Carissa Rosario, Gallienne Nabila, Anya Monzikova Fritts, Sandra Valencia, Lina Posada: Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Order upon Nathan Heida, LLC dba The Alement on 02-03-2025. (Hoffman, Amy)
January 30, 2025 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for John V Golaszewski on behalf of Plaintiffs Jessica Nichole Rockwell, Monica Leigh Burkhardt, Irina Voronina, Tiffany Gray, Katarina Van Derham, Carissa Rosario, Gallienne Nabila, Anya Monzikova Fritts, Sandra Valencia, Lina Posada. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
January 29, 2025 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing - AO 120 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Patent or TrademarkAO 121 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Copyright filed by Jessica Nichole Rockwell, Monica Leigh Burkhardt, Irina Voronina, Tiffany Gray, Katarina Van Derham, Carissa Rosario, Gallienne Nabila, Anya Monzikova Fritts, Sandra Valencia, Lina Posada. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Hoffman, Amy)
January 24, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Senior Judge Douglas L Rayes on 1/23/2025. (SST)
January 23, 2025 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading. (REK)
January 23, 2025 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Nathan K Heida, Unknown Heida, Nathan Heida LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(REK). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
January 23, 2025 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-23902507. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Douglas L Rayes. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-25-00207-PHX-DLR. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REK)
January 23, 2025 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Jessica Nichole Rockwell, Monica Leigh Burkhardt, Irina Voronina, Tiffany Gray, Katarina Van Derham, Carissa Rosario, Gallienne Nabila, Anya Monzikova Fritts, Sandra Valencia, Lina Posada. (submitted by Amy Hoffman) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(REK)
January 23, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $405.00, receipt number AAZDC-23902507 filed by Jessica Nichole Rockwell, Gallienne Nabila, Irina Voronina, Katarina Van Derham, Monica Leigh Burkhardt, Lina Posada, Tiffany Gray, Carissa Rosario, Anya Monzikova Fritts, Sandra Valencia. (submitted by Amy Hoffman) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(REK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gray et al v. Nathan Heida LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Gray
Represented By: John V Golaszewski
Represented By: Amy Wilkins Hoffman
Represented By: John V Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Toth
Represented By: John V Golaszewski
Represented By: Amy Wilkins Hoffman
Represented By: John V Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Valencia
Represented By: John V Golaszewski
Represented By: Amy Wilkins Hoffman
Represented By: John V Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lina Posada
Represented By: John V Golaszewski
Represented By: Amy Wilkins Hoffman
Represented By: John V Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Nichole Rockwell
Represented By: John V Golaszewski
Represented By: Amy Wilkins Hoffman
Represented By: John V Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monica Leigh Burkhardt
Represented By: John V Golaszewski
Represented By: Amy Wilkins Hoffman
Represented By: John V Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irina Voronina
Represented By: John V Golaszewski
Represented By: Amy Wilkins Hoffman
Represented By: John V Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katarina Van Derham
Represented By: John V Golaszewski
Represented By: Amy Wilkins Hoffman
Represented By: John V Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carissa Rosario
Represented By: John V Golaszewski
Represented By: Amy Wilkins Hoffman
Represented By: John V Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gallienne Nabila
Represented By: John V Golaszewski
Represented By: Amy Wilkins Hoffman
Represented By: John V Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anya Monzikova Fritts
Represented By: John V Golaszewski
Represented By: Amy Wilkins Hoffman
Represented By: John V Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathan Heida LLC an Arizona limited liability company doing business as Alement
Represented By: Michael August Ludwig
Represented By: Erik John Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathan K Heida
Represented By: Michael August Ludwig
Represented By: Erik John Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Heida
Represented By: Michael August Ludwig
Represented By: Erik John Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lane Heida (per doc.
Represented By: Michael August Ludwig
Represented By: Erik John Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?