Lorig #345970 v. Arizona Department of Corrections Rehabilitation and Reentry
Plaintiff: Justin Lee Lorig
Defendant: Arizona Department of Corrections Rehabilitation and Reentry
Case Number: 2:2025cv00222
Filed: January 24, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Michael T Morrissey (PS)
Referring Judge: John J Tuchi
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying without prejudice #8 Plaintiff's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Within 30 days of the date this Order is filed, Plaintiff must either pay the $350.00 filing fee and $55.00 administrative fee or file a complete Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and a certified six-month trust account statement. The Clerk shall enter judgment of dismissal without prejudice and deny any pending unrelated motions as moot if Plaintiff fails to comply. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 3/21/25. (DXD)
March 10, 2025 Filing 10 NOTICE by Justin Lee Lorig (3 pages). (DXD)
February 25, 2025 Filing 9 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Justin Lee Lorig (5 pages). (DXD)
February 25, 2025 Filing 8 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Justin Lee Lorig (2 pages). (DXD)
February 13, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff has 30 days from the filing date of this Order to either pay the filing and administrative fees or file a complete Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. The Clerk shall enter judgment of dismissal without prejudice and deny any pending unrelated motions as moot if Plaintiff fails to comply. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 2/13/25. (DXD)
February 7, 2025 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time by Justin Lee Lorig (1 page). (DXD)
January 31, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying without prejudice #2 Plaintiff's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Within 30 days of the date this Order is filed, Plaintiff must either pay the $350.00 filing fee and $55.00 administrative fee or file a complete Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and a certified six-month trust account statement. The Clerk shall enter judgment of dismissal without prejudice and deny any pending unrelated motions as moot if Plaintiff fails to comply. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 1/31/25. (DXD)
January 24, 2025 Filing 4 NOTICE: This case is subject to electronic filing. Please review the attached documents. (DXD)
January 24, 2025 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (Attachments: #1 Instructions) (DXD)
January 24, 2025 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Justin Lee Lorig (2 pages). (DXD)
January 24, 2025 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed by Justin Lee Lorig (6 pages).(DXD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lorig #345970 v. Arizona Department of Corrections Rehabilitation and Reentry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Lee Lorig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arizona Department of Corrections Rehabilitation and Reentry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?