Milbrandt v. Sunwest Mortgage Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Pearl M Milbrandt and Pearl Milbrandt
Defendant: Sunwest Mortgage Corporation, Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, Tiffany & Bosco PA and Quintairos Prieto Wood & Boyer PA
Case Number: 2:2025cv00225
Filed: January 24, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Krissa M Lanham
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2025 Filing 12 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, Quintairos Prieto Wood & Boyer PA, Sunwest Mortgage Corporation, Tiffany & Bosco PA filed by Pearl M Milbrandt. (10 Pages)(REK)
February 28, 2025 Filing 11 NOTICE OF PARTY'S CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Pearl M Milbrandt: 2960 E El Moro Ave., Mesa, AZ 85204. (1 Page) (REK)
February 10, 2025 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, Sunwest Mortgage Corporation filed by Pearl M Milbrandt. (6 Pages)(REK)
February 4, 2025 Filing 9 CLERK'S JUDGMENT - Pursuant to the Court's order filed February 4, 2025, Plaintiff to take nothing, and the complaint and action are dismissed without prejudice. (REK)
February 4, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: The Complaint and Request for Injunction #1 is DISMISSED WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND. The Clerk of Court shall enter a judgment of dismissal without prejudice and close this case. The Application #2 is GRANTED. The Motion to Compel #3 is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Krissa M Lanham on 2/04/2025. (REK)
January 27, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that this matter has been reassigned by random lot to the Honorable Krissa M. Lanham. All future pleadings and papers submitted for filing shall bear the following complete case number: CV-25-0225-PHX-KML. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah M Fine on 1/27/2025. (cc: KML)(REK)
January 24, 2025 Filing 5 NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (BAS)
January 24, 2025 Filing 4 This case has been assigned to the Honorable Deborah M. Fine. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV25-00225-PHX-DMF. Magistrate Election form attached. (Attachments: #1 Instructions)(BAS)
January 24, 2025 Filing 3 MOTION to Compel documentation of corporate records by Pearl M Milbrandt. (BAS)
January 24, 2025 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Pearl M Milbrandt. (BAS)
January 24, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND REQUEST FOR INJUNCTION filed by Pearl M Milbrandt.(BAS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Milbrandt v. Sunwest Mortgage Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pearl M Milbrandt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pearl Milbrandt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunwest Mortgage Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiffany & Bosco PA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quintairos Prieto Wood & Boyer PA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?