Moderne Communities LLC v. Moderne Mortgage LLC
Plaintiff: Moderne Communities LLC
Defendant: Moderne Mortgage LLC
Case Number: 2:2025cv00293
Filed: January 30, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Krissa M Lanham
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2025 Filing 19 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Moderne Communities LLC. (Parker, Emily)
March 28, 2025 Filing 18 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Moderne Communities LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Parker, Emily)
March 10, 2025 Filing 17 NOTICE of Filing - AO 120 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Patent or Trademark filed by Moderne Mortgage LLC. (Tarwater, Devin)
March 3, 2025 Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER: Supplemental Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. An answer, amended complaint, or other pleading #13 has been filed that may include additional trademarks, patents, or copyrights allegedly violated that were not previously included. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that may need to be completed by the party who filed the above document.If your recently filed pleading adds or changes information related to the original patents, trademarks, or copyright allegations, please complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms. Within seven (7) days, you must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form.If there are no changes to the copyright, trademark, or patent information previously submitted for this case, then the party who filed the above document must file a Notice, within seven (7) days, indicating such using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. (EJA)
March 3, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER - Both counsel and pro se litigants must abide by the Rules of Practice of the U.S. District Court for the District of Arizona ("Local Rules") and the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Krissa M Lanham on 2/28/2025. (NSH)
February 28, 2025 Filing 14 Disclosure Statement by Moderne Mortgage LLC. (Tarwater, Devin)
February 28, 2025 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Moderne Mortgage LLC.(Tarwater, Devin)
February 19, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. IT IS ORDERED that Defendant shall file their answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint no later than February 28 2025. Ordered by Judge Krissa M Lanham on 2/19/2025. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NSH)
February 19, 2025 Filing 11 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint by Moderne Mortgage LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Tarwater, Devin)
February 19, 2025 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Devin M Tarwater on behalf of Moderne Mortgage LLC. (Tarwater, Devin)
February 7, 2025 Filing 9 NOTICE by Moderne Communities LLC re: #6 Order,,, Set Deadlines,, Notice of Service of Preliminary Order [ECF No. 6]. (Parker, Emily)
February 7, 2025 Filing 8 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Moderne Communities LLC: Certificate of Service re: Civil Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge, Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark, and Preliminary Order upon Moderne Mortgage, LLC by Service Upon its Statutory Agent Cogency Global, Inc. on 1/31/2025. (Parker, Emily)
January 31, 2025 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Moderne Mortgage LLC. (BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
January 30, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - Both counsel and pro se litigants must abide by the Rules of Practice of the U.S. District Court for the District of Arizona ("Local Rules") and the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff(s) must promptly serve a copy of this order on defendant(s) and file a notice of service with the Clerk of Court. FURTHER ORDERED that, unless the Court orders otherwise, onMay 2, 2025, the Clerk of Court shall terminate without further notice any defendant in the United States that has not been served pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Krissa M Lanham on 1/30/2025. (NSH)
January 30, 2025 Filing 5 SUMMONS Submitted by Moderne Communities LLC. (Parker, Emily)
January 30, 2025 Filing 4 Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-23930603. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Krissa M Lanham. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-25-00293-PHX-KML. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REK)
January 30, 2025 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing - AO 120 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Patent or Trademark filed by Moderne Communities LLC. (submitted by Emily Parker) (REK)
January 30, 2025 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement by Moderne Communities LLC. (submitted by Emily Parker) (REK)
January 30, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $405.00, receipt number AAZDC-23930603 filed by Moderne Communities LLC. (submitted by Emily Parker) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(REK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moderne Communities LLC v. Moderne Mortgage LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Moderne Communities LLC
Represented By: Emily Rachel Parker
Represented By: David Gary Barker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moderne Mortgage LLC
Represented By: Katherine Lane Kane
Represented By: Devin M Tarwater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?