Novo Nordisk A/S et al v. Dr. Greg Jones PLLC
Plaintiff: Novo Nordisk A/S and Novo Nordisk Incorporated
Defendant: Dr. Greg Jones PLLC doing business as Enovative Wellnes Center
Case Number: 2:2025cv00310
Filed: January 30, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2025 Filing 14 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Novo Nordisk A/S, Novo Nordisk Incorporated: Certificate of Service re: 1) Summons; 2) Corporate Disclosure Statement; 3) Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark; 4) Consent to Exercise Jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge; 5) Complaint; 6) Civil Cover Sheet upon Dr. Greg Jones (Greg Jones, NMD) on 02/18/2025. (Augur, Haley)
March 13, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED affirming the time for Defendant to file an answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint is May 12, 2025. There will be no further extension. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Senior District Judge G Murray Snow on 3/12/2025. (KLG)
March 12, 2025 Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge G Murray Snow. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-25-00310-PHX-GMS. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
March 11, 2025 Filing 11 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
March 11, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting the parties' Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint #8 . IT IS FURTHER ORDERED extending the time for Defendant to file an answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint up to and including May 12, 2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah M Fine on 3/11/2025. (KLG)
March 10, 2025 Filing 8 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by Dr. Greg Jones PLLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Roberts, Daniel)
March 3, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that Novo Nordisk A/S, Novo Nordisk Incorporated show cause for failure to comply with LRCiv 3.7(b) before Judge John J Tuchi. Show Cause Hearing set for 3/25/2025 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 505, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge John J Tuchi. (Attachments: #1 Instructions, #2 Consent Form)(MAP)
January 31, 2025 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Dr. Greg Jones PLLC. (REK). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
January 30, 2025 Filing 5 Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-23932160. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Deborah M Fine. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-25-00310-PHX-DMF. Magistrate Election form attached. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form)(REK)
January 30, 2025 Filing 4 SUMMONS Submitted by Novo Nordisk A/S, Novo Nordisk Incorporated. (submitted by Haley Augur) (REK)
January 30, 2025 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing - AO 120 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Patent or Trademark filed by Novo Nordisk A/S, Novo Nordisk Incorporated. (submitted by Haley Augur) (REK)
January 30, 2025 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement by Novo Nordisk A/S, Novo Nordisk Incorporated. (submitted by Haley Augur) (REK)
January 30, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $405.00, receipt number AAZDC-23932160 filed by Novo Nordisk A/S, Novo Nordisk Incorporated. (submitted by Haley Augur) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(REK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Novo Nordisk A/S et al v. Dr. Greg Jones PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Novo Nordisk A/S
Represented By: Haley Augur
Represented By: Cameron Ailes Fine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Novo Nordisk Incorporated
Represented By: Haley Augur
Represented By: Cameron Ailes Fine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Greg Jones PLLC doing business as Enovative Wellnes Center
Represented By: Lauren Elliott Stine
Represented By: Daniel Geary Roberts
Represented By: Christian Guillermo Stahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?