Rubalcava v. Penzone et al
Plaintiff: William Jose Rubalcava
Defendant: Paul Penzone, Maricopa County Board of Supervisors and Maricopa, County of
Case Number: 2:2025cv00599
Filed: February 21, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Alison S Bachus (PS)
Referring Judge: Michael T Liburdi
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2025 Filing 9 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by William Jose Rubalcava (5 pages). (DXD)
March 27, 2025 Filing 8 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to William Rubalcava. Reason for return: Released 2/28/25. Document number #2 . (DXD)
March 18, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying as moot #4 Plaintiff's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Within 30 days of the date this Order is filed, Plaintiff must either pay the $350.00 filing fee and $55.00 administrative fee or file a file a non-prisoner Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. The Clerk shall enter judgment of dismissal without prejudice and deny any pending unrelated motions as moot if Plaintiff fails to comply. Signed by Judge Michael T Liburdi on 3/17/25. (DXD)
March 6, 2025 Filing 6 NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (DXD)
March 3, 2025 Filing 5 NOTICE re: to the Court by William Jose Rubalcava (5 pages). (DXD)
March 3, 2025 Filing 4 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by William Jose Rubalcava (2 pages). (DXD)
March 3, 2025 Filing 3 NOTICE OF PARTY'S CHANGE OF ADDRESS by William Jose Rubalcava: 2727 E University Dr, #123, Tempe, AZ 85288 (2 pages). (DXD)
February 21, 2025 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (Attachments: #1 Instructions) (DXD)
February 21, 2025 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed by William Jose Rubalcava (11 pages). (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(DXD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rubalcava v. Penzone et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Jose Rubalcava
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Penzone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maricopa County Board of Supervisors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maricopa, County of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?