Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. AutoZone Inc

Case Number: 3:2006cv01767
Filed: July 17, 2006
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Prescott Division Office
Presiding Judge: Paul G Rosenblatt
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 17, 2008 163 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on Remaining Motions in Limine: denying 131 Motion in Limine; denying 133 Motion in Limine No.1; denying 134 Motion in Limine No. 2; denying 135 Motion in Limine No. 3; granting 138 Motion in Limine No.6 ; denying 140 Motion in Limine No. 8; denying 141 Motion in Limine that Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude Testimony of Defense Expert Ginger McRae. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 12/16/08.(DMT, )
September 29, 2008 126 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER that Pla EEOC's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 112 is granted to the extent that the Court finds pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 56(d)(1) that there are no material facts genuinely at issue regarding dft AutoZone, Inc.'s f ailure to retain certain specified documents for purposes of 29 C.F.R. § 1602.14, and it is denied in all other respects. FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file their Joint Pretrial Statement and any motions in limine no later than November 14, 2008. FURTHER ORDERED that the final Pretrial Conference shall be held on Monday, December 8, 2008, at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 601. That the parties' trial briefs, proposed jury instructions and proposed voir dire questions shall be filed no later than December 19, 2008, by 11:00 a.m. FURTHER ORDERED that the trial of this action shall commence on Tuesday, January 13, 2009, at 9:00 a.m. at the U.S. Post Office and Courthouse, Second Floor, 101 W. Goodwin, Prescott, AZ.. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 9/29/08.(KMG, )
September 15, 2008 125 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot Defendant AutoZone's 110 Motion for Summary Judgment; plaintiff Equal Employment Opportunity Commission is barred from seeking damages for any claims set forth in paragraphs 12 and 13 of its Complaint. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 9/15/08.(REW, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. AutoZone Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?