Bleeker v. Johanns

Plaintiff: Lynn M Bleeker
Defendant: Mike Johanns
Case Number: 3:2007cv00413
Filed: February 23, 2007
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Prescott Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David K Duncan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 2, 2009 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 102 Motion for Summary Judgment (see order details). Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 12/2/2009.(TCA, )
November 3, 2008 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Count IV-Age Discrimination in Employment Act of Plaintiff's Complaint 1 is dismissed without prejudice re 93 Stipulation of dismissal. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 10/31/08. (TLJ)
October 22, 2008 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED granting Pla's 88 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Dft's Motion for Summary Jgm (First Request). FURTHER ORDERED that the last day for Plas to file a response to the motion for summary jgm is extended to 10/27/08. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 10/22/08.(SAT)
September 8, 2008 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part 82 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time, Dispositive motions due by 9/19/2008. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 9/5/08.(LSP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bleeker v. Johanns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynn M Bleeker
Represented By: Gerald Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Johanns
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?