Baker v. TranUnion, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Christine Baker
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions Inc, NCO Financial Systems, Inc., Dana Capital Group, Dana Smith, Mutual Benefit Funding, Anthony Paduano, Vincent Sanfilippo and TransUnion, LLC
Case Number: 3:2007cv08032
Filed: June 15, 2007
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Prescott Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Earl H Carroll
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 19, 2009 184 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED Granting the Motions for Summary Judgment of DefendantsEquifax (Doc. # 149 ), Experian (Doc. #[154), and Trans Union (Doc. # 151 ). FURTHER ORDERED Denying Trans Union's 168 Motion to Strike Pla's Summary Jgm Evidenc e. FURTHER ORDERED that this Order terminates the case because no claims remain after Pla's 51 voluntary dismissal of Dfts Paduano, Sanfilippo, Dana Smith, Dana Capital Group, and Mutual Benefit Funding on 1/22/08, Pla's 145 acceptance of the Offer of Jgm from Dft NCO Financial Systems, Inc., and the Court's granting of the summary jgm motions. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall enter jgm for Pla Christine Baker against Dft NCO financial Systems, Inc. in the amount of two th ousand dollars ($2000) pursuant to her acceptance of the 145 Offer of Jgm and that Clerk shall enter jgm for Dfts Equifax Information Services LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., and Trans Union against Pla pursuant to this Order. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 11/19/09. (SAT)
June 24, 2009 160 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Defendants' 146 Motion for Sanctions under Rule 37(d). Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 6/24/09.(REW, )
April 14, 2009 144 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 135 Defendants Trans Union, Equifax Information Services, Experian Information Solutions, and NCO Financial System's Motion to Dismiss Case or in the Alternative For Security of Costs. If Defendants choose to file a motion for monetary sanctions, they must do so by 4/30/09. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 4/14/09.(LSP)
November 6, 2008 113 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING in part and DENYING in part Dft Trans Union's Motion to Dismiss 84 . It is ordered granting the Motion with regard to the §1681g, §1681b, §1681e(a), §1681i, and tortious interference claims against Trans Union. It is ordered denying the motion to dismiss with regard to the §1681e(b) claim against Trans Union. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 11/5/08.(KMG, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker v. TranUnion, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NCO Financial Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Capital Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mutual Benefit Funding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Paduano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vincent Sanfilippo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TransUnion, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?