Rause et al v. Paperchine, Inc et al

Plaintiff: Gabriel Rodriguez and Diana Rause
Defendant: Paperchine, Inc and ABITIBI Consolidated Sales Corporation
Case Number: 3:2007cv08076
Filed: August 15, 2007
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Prescott Division Office
County: Yavapai
Presiding Judge: Stephen M McNamee
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Wrongful Death
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 30, 2010 239 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OF DECISION AND ORDER:ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion for Partial Summary Judgment isdenied (Doc. 135).FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Abitibis Cross-Motion for PartialSummary Judgment is granted as to premises liability under Restatement &# 167; 422 and denied asto retained control under Restatement § 414 (Doc. 148).FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Paperchines Cross-Motion for SummaryJudgment (Doc. 157) is granted as to premises liability under Restatement § 422, and vicariousli ability pursuant to Restatement § 424. The motion is denied as to retained control underRestatement § 414.FURTHER ORDERED setting a status conference in this case for October 12,2010, at 11:30am.. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 9/30/2010.(TCA)
April 6, 2010 189 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting re 188 REQUEST re: Joint Request to Extend Deadlines (Second Request) by Defendant Paperchine, Inc. Dispositive motions due by 11/12/2010. Status Conference set for 9/13/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 605, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Stephen M McNamee.(see order details). Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 4/6/2010. (TCA)
November 17, 2009 144 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 138 Stipulation re: Discovery Deadlines: Dispositive motions due by 7/16/2010. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 11/17/2009. (TCA, )
October 23, 2009 134 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER no later than November 30, 2009, Johnny Mendoza, Sr. shall appear through a licensed attorney or in propria persona and notify the Court of his intention to pursue a claim in this case. The Clerk shall send a copy of this Order to Johnny Mendoza, Sr. at the addresses listed in this order. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 10/23/09. (LSP)
September 10, 2009 123 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Pla is to submit a status report by 10/16/09 updating the Court on counsel's efforts to have a guardian ad litem appointed in Texas. It is further ordered that the previous deadline of 10/02/09 for submitting the status report is VACATED. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 09/10/09. (ESL)
March 18, 2009 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER pursuant to 85 Stipulation: Discovery Deadlines have been extended as stated in the PDF document. The Court will set dates for discovery relatedto damages following the next status hearing, scheduled for May 4, 2009. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 3/17/09. (LSP)
March 3, 2009 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ORDERED setting a show cause hearing before the HonorableStephen M. McNamee for 5/4/09 at 1:30 p.m. Plaintiff Gabriel Rodriguez shall APPEAR in person at this hearing to show good cause why this case should not be dismissed pur suant to Rule 41(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure for failure to prosecute. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall send copies of this Order to plaintiff Gabriel Rodriguez and all counsel of record. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 3/2/09. (MAP)
February 18, 2009 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 76 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff Gabriel Rodriguez, Attorney Thomas C Hall terminated. Plaintiff Gabriel Rodriguez shall appear at the status hearing scheduled for 3/2/09 at 1:30, the Court will allow him to appear telephonically. The Clerk shall send a copy of this Order as well as all further communications intended for said Plaintiff to Gabriel Rodriguez, 9427 Valley Ridge, San Antonio, Texas 78250. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 2/17/09.(LSP)
January 9, 2009 74 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff Gabriel Rodriguez's Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; the motion is granted as to attorney K Thomas Slack, and denied as to pro hac vice admittee Thomas C Hall; if Thomas C Hall wishes t o withdraw as counsel for Plaintiff Gabriel Rodriguez, he must bring a separate withdrawal motion; the Clerk Court shall send a copy of this Order as well as all further communications intended for said Plaintiff to Gabriel Rodriguez, 9427 Valley Ridge, San Antonio Texas 78250, as well as to attorney Thomas C Hall, re: 72 ORDER. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 1/8/09. (REW, )
January 6, 2009 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 69 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; the motion is granted as to attorney K Thomas Slack, and denied as to pro hac vice admittee Thomas C Hall; if Thomas C Hall wishes to withdraw as counsel for Plaintiff Ga briel Rodriguez, he must bring a separate withdrawal motion; the Clerk Court shall send a copy of this Order as well as all further communications intended for said Plaintiff to Gabriel Rodriguez, 9427 Valley Ridge, San Antonio Texas 78250, as well as to attorney Thomas C Hall. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 1/5/09.(REW, )
December 4, 2008 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting a telephonic discovery dispute hearing for 12/8/08 at 11:30 a.m. before Judge Stephen M McNamee re 62 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 12/3/08. (TLJ)
November 26, 2008 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 46 Motion in Limine Regarding Occupational Safety and Health Administration (OSHA) Investigations or Citations without prejudice with leave to refile. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 11/26/08.(DNH)
September 23, 2008 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 56 Stipulation to extend deadlines: Discovery due by 9/30/2009. Dispositive motions due by 10/30/2009. See order for full details. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 9/22/08. (DMT, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rause et al v. Paperchine, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel Rodriguez
Represented By: Keith Thomas Slack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana Rause
Represented By: Keith Thomas Slack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paperchine, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABITIBI Consolidated Sales Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?