Kanger v. Schriro et al

Petitioner: Kenneth James Kanger
Respondent: Dora Schriro and Arizona Attorney General, State of
Case Number: 3:2007cv08094
Filed: September 7, 2007
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Prescott Division Office
County: Coconino
Referring Judge: Michelle H Burns (PS)
Presiding Judge: Paul G Rosenblatt
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 14, 2013 113 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 110 Petitioner's Motion for Relief from a Judgment/Order Under Rule 60(b). ORDER denying a certificate of appealability. Signed by Senior Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 8/14/13.(TLJ)
November 8, 2011 106 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying a certificate of appealability. The Court finds that Petitioner has not made a substantial showing of the denial of a constitutional right. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court forward this Order and the case record to the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant's letter for extension of time to appeal (Doc. 99 ), which the Court has construed as a motion, is denied as moot. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 11/07/11.(ESL)
September 19, 2011 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 93 Petitioner's Motion for Relief from Judgment. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 9/19/11.(TLJ)
November 4, 2008 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation is ACCEPTED and ADOPTED by the Court. FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioner's 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus is DISMISSED and DENIED with prejudice. FURTH ER ORDERED that Petitioner's 73 "Motion for Single Cell Housing at County Jail During Habeas Evidentiary Hearing Proceedings" ; Petitioner's 77 "Motion that Upon Return to Coconino Jail Single Cell Only Housing and Requir ements of and Legal Materials and Supplies and Copying for My Initially Self Representation in Superior Court" and Petitioner's 80 "Motion for Orders to Prison Staff May Not Ever Take From Me Nor Hold From Me Any Reading/Seeing Glasses" are hereby DENIED as MOOT. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court is directed to enter judgment accordingly and close this case. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 11/3/08. (SAT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kanger v. Schriro et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kenneth James Kanger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Dora Schriro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Arizona Attorney General, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?