Satala v. Schriro et al

Petitioner: Robert Daniel Satala
Respondent: Dora B Schriro and Arizona Attorney General, State of
Case Number: 3:2008cv08137
Filed: October 24, 2008
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
County: Pinal
Referring Judge: Michelle H Burns (PS)
Presiding Judge: Mary H Murguia
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 27, 2010 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 26 . ORDER that the Court has reviewed the pleadings and has determined that a Certificate of Appealability and Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is not appropriate, since Petitioner has not made a substantial showing of the denial of a constitutional right. ORDER that the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus is denied and dismissed with prejudice. ORDER directing the Clerk to enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 1/26/10. (TLJ)
September 1, 2009 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as premature and with leave to refile petitioner's 4 Motion to stay proceedings and hold in abeyance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns on 8/31/2009. (LAD)
June 18, 2009 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 21 Motion for Extension of Time - The Court in its discretion, will allow Petitioner an additional 30 days from the date of his request (June 10, 2009) until July 10, 2009 to file a reply. No further extensions will be granted without a showing of good cause, supported by specific facts demonstrating why in the exercise of due diligence, a reply could not be filed in time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns on 6/17/09.(KMG, )
June 15, 2009 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Petitioner's Motion 19 for Reconsideration is DENIED; Petitioner, however, shall file his reply to Respondents' Answer to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus no later than June 17, 2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns on 6/11/09.(KMG, )
March 31, 2009 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part petitioner's 12 Request for Production of Documents. FURTHER ORDERED that respondents provide to petitioner, if available, a copy of the post-conviction docket from the Navajo County Superior Court in Petitioner's case. If a copy of the docket is not available, respondents shall provide petitioner within 10 days of this ORDER with a list of all documents in the State's possession that were filed post-conviction in the Navajo County Supe rior Court, along with the date on which each document was filed. FURTHER ORDERED that petitioner's request for an extension of time to reply to respondents' answer is granted. Petitioner shall file his reply to respondents' answer no later than 45 days from the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns on 3/30/2009. (LAD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Satala v. Schriro et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Robert Daniel Satala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Dora B Schriro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Arizona Attorney General, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?