Center for Biological Diversity v. United States Bureau of Land Management, et al

Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity
Defendant: United States Bureau of Land Management, Ron Wenker, James Kenna and Ken Salazar
Case Number: 3:2009cv08011
Filed: January 27, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Environmental Matters Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Lawrence O Anderson
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 42:4321 Review of Agency Action-Environment

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 29, 2011 133 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 123 Motion to Seal. ORDERED that the four original documents containing sensitive cultural resources information that are within the ranges ASRMP 3751418, ASRMP 54510612, ASRMP 5463135, and ASRMP 5463643, which were submitted on compact disks on June 3, 2010 (Doc. 87 ), are sealed by the Court. The Clerk's Office shall only distribute copies of the redacted replacement documents to the public. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 9/28/11.(MAP)
April 12, 2010 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that a scheduling conference has been scheduled forMonday, April 26, 2010, at 11:30 a.m., in Courtroom 601, Phoenix, Arizona.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED GRANTING SCIs Motion for Amicus Curiae Status.(Doc. 56.)IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that SCI may file responsive briefs within the scope ofthe pending legal claims according to future briefing schedules.. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 4/12/2010.(TCA)
January 13, 2010 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING the Motion to Intervene. (Doc. 39.) The intervention is limited to Claims four and five in the Complaint. However, the NRA may file its own briefs throughout the pendency of the lawsuit, it is not limited to filing joint briefs with the current Defendants. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 1/13/2010.(TCA, )
June 2, 2009 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that unless and until 3:09-cv-08010 PCT PGR and 3:09-cv-08011 PCT PGR are consolidated by order of this Court, each party shall use only its respective case number when filing documents with the Court and include only their respective case number on such documents. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 6/2/2009. (LAD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Center for Biological Diversity v. United States Bureau of Land Management, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity
Represented By: Adam Keats
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Bureau of Land Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Wenker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Kenna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Salazar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?