Felix et al v. Pic-N-Run, Inc., et al

Plaintiff: Dorthy Felix and Daniel Felix
Defendant: Pic-N-Run, Inc., Environmental Protection Agency, Stella Jeanette Eldridge, Vernon W Eldridge, Milam Building Associates, Inc., Navajo Nation Environmental Protection Agency and Navajo Nation
Case Number: 3:2009cv08015
Filed: January 30, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Environmental Matters Office
County: Apache
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 42:6901 Resource & Recovery Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 21, 2012 216 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 203 the Reidel Defendants' Motion for an Award of Costs and Attorneys' Fees. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 2/21/12.(TLJ)
August 10, 2011 201 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 181 Motion to Dismiss; granting 182 Motion to Dismiss to the extent the motions are premised upon 28:1367(c)(3). ORDER that the Clerk of Court shall dismiss this action in its entirety without prejudice. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 8/10/11.(TLJ)
May 4, 2010 150 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 83 Motion to Dismiss Plas Daniel and Dorothy Felix's 2nd amended complaint to the extent it is premised upon a lack of subject matter jurisdiction as discussed above; granting 120 Motion to Dismiss Milam Building, Stella Jeane tte Eldridge and Vernon W. Eldridge's cross-claim to the extent it is premised upon a lack of subject matter jurisdiction as discussed above; granting 121 Motion to Dismiss Pic-N-Run's cross-claim to the extent it is premised upon a lack of subject matter jurisdiction as discussed above. FURTHER ORDERED dismissing all RCRA claims, counter-claims, and cross-claims involved in this action. FURTHER ORDERED dismissing dft Navajo Nation as a party to this action. FINALLY ORDERED granting 125 Motion to Dismiss the RCRA claims to the extent it is premised upon a lack of subject matter jurisdiction as discussed above. (See document for full details). Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 5/4/10.(LAD)
October 22, 2009 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plas' motion 49 to amend is granted; however, the Clerk of the Court shall not file the proposed second amended complaint lodged at Doc.# 50 because it is a redlined version of the document. Pla shall file the proposed second amend ed complaint (not redlined) by October 26, 2009. If Plas fail to comply, this case will be dismissed without prejudice for failure to comply with a Court order. Fed.R.Civ.Pro. 41(b). FURTHER ORDERED that Pla shall serve the two newly added Dfts (Unde rground Analytical Services, Inc. and Petroleum Systems Incorporated) by November 20, 2009. Regardless of when they are served or whether they are served by waiver, the newly added Dfts shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by December 2 1, 2009. If Plas again forget to provide the not-yet-appearing Dfts with a copy of this Order, the Court will dismiss said Dfts for Plas' failure to comply with a court order and failure to prosecute. Fed.R.Civ.Pro. 41(b). FURTHER ORDERED that r esponses to the second amended complaint (including answers, counterclaims, and motions to dismiss) are due by November 20, 2009. FURTHER ORDERED that, going forward, no party may use "et al." in a caption. FURTHER ORDERED that, as the resu lt of the filing of a second amended complaint, all remaining pending motions are denied, without prejudice, as moot, specifically: Motions to dismiss 31 , 32 , to amend answer 33 , to dismiss 37 , 43 , 59 , 61 , for extension of time 63 , to dismiss 67 , to stay 68 , for extension 70 . FURTHER ORDERED vacating oral argument on January 11, 2010. FINALLY ORDERED that due to the age of this case, there will be NO EXTENSIONS of these deadlines. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 10/21/09.(KMG, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Felix et al v. Pic-N-Run, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorthy Felix
Represented By: Thomas J Shorall, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Felix
Represented By: Thomas J Shorall, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pic-N-Run, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Environmental Protection Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stella Jeanette Eldridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vernon W Eldridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milam Building Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navajo Nation Environmental Protection Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navajo Nation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?