Weber v. Sheehan et al
Plaintiff: Derrin Jordan Weber
Defendant: Tom Sheehan, Mike Kitchen and David Bounds
Case Number: 3:2009cv08047
Filed: March 19, 2009
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Arizona
Office: Prisoner - Prison Condition Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Presiding Judge: Jay R Irwin (PS)
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER (Service Packet), The Clerk must send Pla a service packet including the Second Amended Complaint Doc. # 14 , this Order, and both summons and request for waiver forms for Defendants Sheahan, Byast, and Kitchen. Pla must complete and return the service packet to the Clerk within 20 days of the date of filing of this Order. The United States Marshal will not provide service of process if Pla fails to comply with this Order. If Pla does not either obtain a waiver of service of the summons or complete service of the Summons and Second Amended Complaint on a Dft within 120 days of the filing of the Complaint or within 60 days of the filing of this Order, whichever is later, the action may be dismissed as to each Dft not served. Fed. R. Ci v.P. 4(m); LRCiv 16.2(b)(2)(B)(i). This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Jay R. Irwin pursuant to Rules 72.1 and 72.2 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure for all pretrial proceedings as authorized under 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1). Service Packet due by 11/23/2009. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 09-8047. (KMG)
April 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER the re 6 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT is dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Pla has 30 days from the date this Order is filed to file a second amended complaint in compliance with this Order. If Pla fails to file a second amended c omplaint within 30 days, the Clerk must, without further notice, enter a judgment of dismissal of this action with prejudice that states that the dismissal counts as a "strike" under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). The Clerk must mail Pla a court-approved form for filing a civil rights complaint by a prisoner. Special Prisoner Deadline due by 5/29/2009.. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/29/09. (KMG, )
March 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The complaint 1 is dismissed for failure to state a claim. Pla has 30 days from the date this order is filed to file a 1st amended complaint in compliance with this order. If pla fai ls to file an amended complaint within 30 days, the Clerk must, without further notice, enter a judgment of dismissal of this action with prejudice that states that the dismissal counts as a "strike" under 28 U.S.C. section 1915(g). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/27/2009. (LAD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weber v. Sheehan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrin Jordan Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Sheehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Kitchen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Bounds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?