Breedlove et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al

Plaintiff: Billy J Breedlove, Jr. and Diana J Breedlove-Jones
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., America's Servicing Company, Arch McDonald and Rebecca Williams
Case Number: 3:2009cv08135
Filed: August 21, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Prescott Division Office
County: Navajo
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 28, 2010 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Wells Fargo Bank's 58 Motion to Dismiss, Defendant Arch McDonald's 59 Motion to Dismiss, and Defendant Mark Bridgewater's 60 Motion to Dismiss are GRANTED. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 07/27/10. (ESL)
March 31, 2010 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice and with leave to re-urge if appropriate the 26 Motion to Dismiss Case; denying as moot the 29 Motion to Strike; denying as moot the 30 Motion for Summary Disposition; granting 35 Motion Requesting Permission t o File Electronically; denying as moot the 37 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot the 39 Motion to Strike; denying 40 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; granting 42 Motion for Leave to File 2nd Amended Complaint; denying as moot the 51 Motion for Expedited Ruling; denying without prejudice and with leave to re-urge if appropriate 18 Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint; denying without prejudice and with leave to re-urge if appropriate the 19 Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint. (See document for full details). Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 3/31/10.(LAD)
September 3, 2009 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Wells Fargo's motion for more definite statement (doc 1-1 at 7) is granted. Plas shall file an amended complaint within 30 days of the date of this order.... FURTHER ORDERED that the motions to dismiss (doc 1-1 at 7 and 5 ) are denie d without prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED if plas fail to file an amended complaint, dfts shall re-respond to the complaint currently on file (doc 1-1 at 4); including re-filing any motions to dismiss if they deem such response to be appropriate. FURTHER ORDERED to the extent the complaint names "et al." as a dft, "et al." is dismissed.... FURTHER ORDERED that within 30 days of the date of this order, plas shall file a status report regarding service on dft Rebecca William. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 9/2/2009. (LAD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Breedlove et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Terence Jermaine Whatley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: America's Servicing Company
Represented By: Terence Jermaine Whatley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arch McDonald
Represented By: Terence Jermaine Whatley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy J Breedlove, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana J Breedlove-Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?