McBurnie v. Prescott, City of, et al.

Plaintiff: Robert McBurnie
Defendant: Prescott, City of
Case Number: 3:2009cv08139
Filed: August 26, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Prescott Division Office
County: Yavapai
Presiding Judge: Frederick J Martone
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 14, 2014 231 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: IT IS ORDERED GRANTING defendants' motion for summary judgment on plaintiff's First Amendment retaliation claim 202 . IT IS FURTHER ORDERED DENYING plaintiff's motion for leave to file memorandum 212 [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick J Martone on 2/14/14.(MAW)
October 30, 2013 198 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the parties shall file a Proposed Pretrial Order by 2/14/2014. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/19/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 506, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Senior Judge Frederick J Martone. Jury Trial set for 3/3/2014 at 9:00 AM before Senior Judge Frederick J Martone. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick J Martone on 10/29/2013. (See Order for details.)(LFIG)
October 24, 2011 172 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 141 Defendants' Motion for Attorney Fees; granting 168 Plaintiff's Motion to modify clerk's judgment on taxation of costs. Costs are taxed for the defendants in the modified amount of $8,714.39. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 10/21/11.(DMT)
April 25, 2011 138 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 135 Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees. The clerk shall enter final judgment in favor of plaintiff and against the City of Prescott in the amount of $19,649.20 on Count 12, and in favor of the defendants and against plaintiff pursuant to our prior orders and the jury verdict on all other counts. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 4/25/11.(DMT)
December 22, 2010 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting pla's 68 motion for summary judgment with respect to the atty's fee claim (count 12), and with respect to dfts' affirmative defenses; granting dfts' 71 motion for summary judgment in favor of the dft spouses, an d in favor of all dfts with respect to counts 3, 8, 11, and 13; denying dfts' 71 motion for summary judgment with respect to the claim for punitive damages and state law claims of wrongful termination (count 1) and intentional interference with contract (count 6). The counts remaining are 1, 2, 4, 5, 6, 7, 9, and 10. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 12/21/10. (LFIG) (Note: see attached pdf for complete details)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McBurnie v. Prescott, City of, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prescott, City of
Represented By: Matthew Philip Podracky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert McBurnie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?