Fox v. Ryan et al

Petitioner: Ronald Fox
Respondent: Charles L Ryan and Attorney General of the State of Arizona
Case Number: 3:2010cv08186
Filed: September 27, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Prescott Division Office
County: Pima
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Referring Judge: Edward C Voss
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 31, 2011 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 23 : Magistrate Judge Voss's R&R (Doc. 23) is accepted. Petitioner's Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Doc. 1) is denied and dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk of Court shall terminate this acti on. Pursuant to Rule 11(a) of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases, in the event Petitioner files an appeal, the Court declines to issue a certificate of appealability because reasonable jurists would not find the Court's procedural ruling debatable. See Slack v. McDaniel, 529 U.S. 473, 484 (2000). (See document for details). Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 8/31/11. (LAD)
March 1, 2011 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - (1) The reference to Magistrate Judge Edward C. Voss is withdrawn only with respect to Petitioner's Objection to the Order of the Court issued December 9, 2010 and Motion for Reconsideration (Doc. 10) and Objection to the Order of the Co urt issued December 9, 2010 and Motion for Reconsideration (Doc. 11). (2) Petitioner's Objection to the Order of the Court issued December 9, 2010 and Motion for Reconsideration (Doc. 10) and Objection to the Order of the Court issued December 9, 2010 and Motion for Reconsideration (Doc. 11) are both denied. (3) All other matters must remain with Magistrate Judge Edward C. Voss for disposition as appropriate. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 3/1/11.(LAD)
December 9, 2010 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Petitioner's Motion for Appointment of Counsel (Doc. 3) is denied without prejudice. Petitioner's claims in the Petition (Doc. 1) that his rights under 28 U.S.C. §§ 1343(a)(1) and (a)(2), 1357, and 1746, as well as 42 U.S. C. § 1986 and Model Penal Code § 5.03 were violated are dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk of Court must serve a copy of the Petition (Doc. 1), Petitioner's Brief in Support of Title 28 U.S.C. § 2254 Application Form #530 (Doc . 4), and this Order on the Respondent and the Attorney General of the State of Arizona by certified mail....This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Edward C. Voss pursuant to Rules 72.1 and 72.2 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure for further proceedings and a report and recommendation. (See document for details). Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 12/9/10.(LAD)
October 5, 2010 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Within 30 days of the date this Order is filed, Petitioner must either pay the $5.00 filing fee or file a completed Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. If Petitioner fails to either pay the $5.00 filing fee or file a completed Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis within 30 days, the Clerk of Court must enter a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice and without further notice to Petitioner. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 10/5/10. (LAD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fox v. Ryan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ronald Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Charles L Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Arizona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?