Bean v. John Wiley & Sons Incorporated

Plaintiff: Tom Bean
Defendant: John Wiley & Sons Incorporated
Case Number: 3:2011cv08028
Filed: February 23, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Prescott Division Office
County: Coconino
Presiding Judge: Frederick J Martone
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 30, 2012 122 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part 100 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Summary Judgment is granted to plaintiff on the issue of defendant's liability for copyright infringement for each instance listed in Exhibits A and B to plaintiff's motion . Plaintiff's request for a pre-trial permanent injunction is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED granting 106 defendant's motion to seal. The Clerk shall file the lodged exhibit (doc. 102 ) under seal. FURTHER ORDERED denying 103 defendant's motion to reinforce the protective order on grounds of mootness. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 3/29/12. (MAP)
March 14, 2012 118 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 99 Plaintiff's Motion to transfer related case CV-12- 08001-PCT-GMS. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 3/14/12.(LSP)
February 1, 2012 108 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 91 Motion to Compel. Each party to bear its own costs. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 2/1/2012.(KAR)
January 17, 2012 104 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Plaintiff's motion to compel keys explaining spreadsheet codes and fees 84 ; Defendant shall provide plaintiff with a key defining all terms contained in Exhibit A to Plaintiff's reply 94 within 5 days; denying Plaintiff's motion to compel production of documents 85 ; each party to bear its own fees and costs. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 1/17/12.(REW)
August 3, 2011 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, granting in part and denying in part Defendant's 31 Motion to Dismiss; granting defendant's motion to dismiss plaintiff's claims for copyright infringement with respect to the images contained in the Corbis compilations; denying defendant's motion to dismiss plaintiff's claims for fraud. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 8/3/11.(REW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bean v. John Wiley & Sons Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tom Bean
Represented By: Christopher Seidman
Represented By: Maurice James Harmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Wiley & Sons Incorporated
Represented By: Ashima Aggarwal
Represented By: David Mark Andersen
Represented By: Joseph J Barker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?