Jewell v. Countrywide Home Loans Incorporated et al

Plaintiff: Renee C Jewell
Defendant: Countrywide Home Loans Incorporated, BAC Home Loans Servicing LP, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Incorporated, ReconTrust Company NA, Bank of New York Mellon and Bank of America
Case Number: 3:2011cv08042
Filed: March 18, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Prescott Division Office
County: Mohave
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1331(a) Fed. Question: Real Property
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 20, 2012 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 21 ). This case is dismissed in its entirety. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 1/20/2012.(KMG)
June 30, 2011 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff shall provide notice to Defendants of the pending motion for a temporary restraining order (Doc. 12) before the Court takes any action on the motion. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that in responding to the motion for temporary restraining order, Defendants shall address the issues raised in Chapman v. Deutsche Bank National Trust Co., No. 10-15215 (9th Cir. June 23, 2011). Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 06/30/11. (ESL)
June 2, 2011 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff shall file a third amended complaint, properly alleging federal subject matter jurisdiction by 6/27/11, or this case will be dismissed without prejudice. It is further ordered that the Court will not consider the request for injunctive relief (Doc. 9 ) until Plaintiff gives notice to Defendants. See Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 65.. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 06/02/11. (ESL)
April 6, 2011 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, by May 4, 2011, Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint properly alleging federal subject matter jurisdiction or this case will be dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 4/6/11. (REW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jewell v. Countrywide Home Loans Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renee C Jewell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countrywide Home Loans Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAC Home Loans Servicing LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ReconTrust Company NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of New York Mellon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?