Riley v. Prescott, City of et al

Plaintiff: KayAnne Riley
Defendant: Prescott, City of, Yavapai Humane Society, Marlin Kuykendall, Tana Kuykendall, Steve Norwood, Shelly Norwood, Ed Boks, Adele Langdon, Martin Goodman and Unknown Goodman
Case Number: 3:2011cv08123
Filed: August 10, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Prescott Division Office
County: Yavapai
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 8, 2016 336 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the motion for relief under Rules 59(e) and 60(b) (Doc. 335 ) is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any motion to continue the Court's proposed December 5, 2016 trial date is due within 7 days. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a joint notice (as specified above) is due within 10 days. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 6/8/2016. (KAL)
June 2, 2014 331 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 330 Parties' Stipulation for Attorneys' Fees. Reasonable attorneys fees and expenses pursuant to this Court's February 19, 2014 Order are hereby awarded to Plaintiff in the amount of $35,000.00 (thirty-five thousand dollars and zero cents). Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 6/2/2014. (TLB)
April 1, 2014 327 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendants' Motion to Stay (Doc. 316 ) the trial proceedings pending the outcome of Defendant Marlin Kuykendall's interlocutory appeal on the issue of qualified immunity is Granted. The Court will not schedule the trial until after the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals rules on Defendants' interlocutory appeal. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 4/1/2014.(KMG)
February 19, 2014 312 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - denying 266 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; ORDERED denying 271 Riley's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; Riley's Motion for Discovery Sanctions (Doc. 271 ) is granted in part and denied in part as set forth i n the attached Order. The parties shall submit proposed adverse inference instructions with the other jury instructions to be filed before trial. ORDERED that the parties are directed to confer in good faith to resolve any disputes concerning the am ount of reasonable expenses and fees related to defendants' spoliation. If the parties are unable to agree, Riley may file a motion pursuant to Local Rule 54.2. See attached Order for details. ORDERED denying 285 Defendants' Cross-Motion for Discovery Sanctions; ORDERED denying 296 Riley's Motion to Strike and ORDERED denying 301 Defendants' Cross-Motion to Strike. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 2/18/2014.(TLB)
February 16, 2012 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the City of Prescott Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 6 ) is denied as to Counts I and III and granted without prejudice as to Counts II, IV, V, VI, and VII, as set forth in this Order. FURTHER ORDERED that the Norwood Defendants Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 18) is granted without prejudice. FINALLY ORDERED that Plaintiff is granted leave to amend and shall file an amended complaint within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 2/16/2012.(KMG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Riley v. Prescott, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KayAnne Riley
Represented By: Daniel Lee Bonnett
Represented By: Mark Allen Bracken
Represented By: Jennifer Lynn Kroll
Represented By: Susan Joan Martin
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Pochoda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prescott, City of
Represented By: James M Jellison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yavapai Humane Society
Represented By: Charles Anthony Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marlin Kuykendall
Represented By: James M Jellison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tana Kuykendall
Represented By: James M Jellison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Norwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelly Norwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ed Boks
Represented By: Charles Anthony Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adele Langdon
Represented By: Charles Anthony Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Goodman
Represented By: Charles Anthony Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Goodman
Represented By: Charles Anthony Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?