Travelers Property Casualty Company of America v. Zurich American Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Farm Bureau Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Mortimer Incorporated and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 3:2011cv08151
Filed: September 28, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Prescott Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 25, 2012 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 10 Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 7/25/12.(LSP)
December 20, 2011 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the motion to dismiss 10 remains pending. Defendants Farm Bureau Property & Casualty Insurance Company and Mortimer, Inc. must answer the amended complaint within 20 days after the Court rules on the pending motion to dismiss (if the motion is denied). ORDER that the remaining Defendants must answer or respond to the amended complaint within 20 days of the date of this Order. ORDER dismissing Does 1-50. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 12/20/11. (TLJ)
November 23, 2011 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that by December 19, 2011, Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint properly alleging federal subject matter jurisdiction or this case will be dismissed, without prejudice. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 11/23/11. (ESL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America v. Zurich American Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Represented By: Raymond Earl Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA
Represented By: Timothy J Thomason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farm Bureau Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortimer Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?