Yount v. Salazar et al

Plaintiff: Gregory Yount
Defendant: Kenneth Lee Salazar and United States Bureau of Land Management
Case Number: 3:2011cv08171
Filed: November 1, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Prescott Division Office
County: Yavapai
Presiding Judge: Frederick J Martone
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 30, 2014 238 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Defendants' motions for summary judgment 198 , 208 are granted; Plaintiffs' motions for summary judgment 167 , 170 , 173 are denied; the Clerk shall enter judgment accordingly and terminate this matter. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 9/30/14.(REW)
July 7, 2014 227 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, oral argument on the all pending motions will be held on July 30, 2014 at 1:30 p.m. before The Honorable David G. Campbell, 401 WestWashington Street, Courtroom 603, Phoenix, Arizona, re: Motions 167 , 170 , 173 , 190 , 198 , 208 . Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/7/14. (REW)
July 12, 2013 152 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 146 Motion for Final Judgment. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/12/2013.(TCA)
May 29, 2013 145 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Plaintiff Yount's motion to require supplementation of the Administrative Record 134 is denied. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/29/13.(REW)
May 16, 2013 144 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiffs' 135 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/16/13.(REW)
March 20, 2013 130 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Plaintiffs' motions for partial summary judgment (Doc. 73 in 3:12-cv-8038-DGC) and 90 are denied; Defendants' cross motions for summary judgment 101 and 102 are granted; Defendants' motion for leave to file supplemental citations 128 is granted; the Clerk is directed to file the document lodged as 129 . Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/20/13. (REW)
January 8, 2013 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Defendants motions to dismiss Plaintiffs Gregory Yount (Doc. 33),National Mining Association and Nuclear Energy Institute (Docs. 39 and 72, No. 3:12-cv-08038), Northwest Mining Association (Doc. 27, No. 3:12-cv-08042), QuaterraAlaska, Inc. and Quaterra Resources, Inc. (Doc. 62), and Vane Minerals (Doc. 68) aredenied with respect to Plaintiffs non-NEPA claims, and granted with respect toPlaintiffs Northwest Mining Associations, Quaterras, Vanes, and Younts NEPAclaims.Defendants motion to di smiss the Arizona Utah Local Economic Coalitionon behalf of named member the Board of Supervisors, Mohave County (Doc. 62) isdenied.Vane Minerals complaint (Doc. 86) is dismissed without prejudice. The Court will address further scheduling issues in a separate order. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 1/8/13.(TLJ)
July 19, 2012 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, granting the alternative Motions to Transfer to a single judge under LRCiv 42.1. (Docs. 28 and 49); transferring CV 11-08171, CV 12-08038, and CV 12-08075 to Judge Campbell, to whom CV 12-08042 is already assigned. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 7/18/12. (REW)
April 20, 2012 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 14 Motion to Intervene. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 4/19/12.(LAD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yount v. Salazar et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Lee Salazar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Bureau of Land Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Yount
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?