Parks v. Mohave County Sheriff's Department et al

Plaintiff: Edward Faye Parks
Defendant: Unknown Parties, Mohave County Superior Court and Mohave County Sheriff's Department
Case Number: 3:2011cv08175
Filed: November 10, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Prescott Division Office
County: Mohave
Referring Judge: David K Duncan (PS)
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 6, 2012 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 12 Plaintiff's Motion to File. This case must remain closed. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 3/6/12.(TLJ)
February 16, 2012 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 9 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Complaint 1 is dismissed without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction, and the Clerk of Court must enter judgment accordingly. The docket shall reflect that the Court certifies, pursuant to 28:1915(a)(3) and Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure 24(a)(3)(A), that any appeal of this decision would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 2/15/12.(TLJ)
January 11, 2012 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice the 6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Within 30 days of the date this Order is filed, Plaintiff must either pay the $350.00 filing fee or file a complete Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and a certified six-month trust account statement. If Plaintiff fails to either pay the $350.00 filing fee or file a complete Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis within 30 days, the Clerk of Court must enter ajudgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice and without further notice to Plaintiff. The Clerk of Court must update Plaintiff's address on the docket to reflect that he is currently confined in the Mohave County Jail. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 1/11/12.(LAD)
December 8, 2011 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER within 30 days of the date this Order is filed, Plaintiff must either pay the $350.00 filing fee or file a completed Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and a certified six-month trust account statement. If Plaintiff fails to comply, the Clerk of Court must enter a judgment of dismissal without prejudice. The Clerk of Court must mail Plaintiff a court-approved form for filing an Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 12/8/11. (TLJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parks v. Mohave County Sheriff's Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohave County Superior Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohave County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Faye Parks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?