Haney v. Mohave, County of et al

Plaintiff: John Lynn Haney
Defendant: Tom Sheahan, Matthew Smith, Mohave, County of and Mohave County Attorneys Office
Case Number: 3:2011cv08197
Filed: December 9, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Prescott Division Office
County: Mohave
Referring Judge: David K Duncan (PS)
Presiding Judge: Robert C Broomfield
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 21, 2012 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the 15 First Amended Complaint is dismissed for failure to state a claim. Plaintiff has 30 days from the date this Order is filed to file a second amended complaint in compliance with this Order. If Plaintiff fails to comply, the Clerk of Court must, without further notice, enter a judgment of dismissal of this action with prejudice that states that the dismissal may count as a "strike" under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). The Clerk of Court must mail Plaintiff a court-app roved form for filing a civil rights complaint by a prisoner. Plaintiff's 14 motion for appointment of counsel is denied; Plaintiff's 16 , 17 , 18 and 19 Motions to Amend are denied. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 6/20/2012.(LFIG)
March 22, 2012 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 5 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend; granting 6 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Complaint is dismissed for failure to state a claim 1 . Plaintiff has 30 days from the date this Order is filed to f ile a first amended complaint. If Plaintiff fails to comply, the Clerk of Court must enter a judgment of dismissal with prejudice that states that the dismissal may count as a strike under 28:1915(g). The Clerk of Court must mail Plaintiff a court-approved form for filing a civil rights complaint by a prisoner. Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 3/21/12.(TLJ)
January 13, 2012 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice Plaintiff's 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; within 30 days Plaintiff must either pay the $350.00 filing fee or file a completed Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and a certified six-month trust account statement; if Plaintiff fails to comply with this order, the Clerk must enter a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice and without further notice to Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 1/13/12.(REW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haney v. Mohave, County of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Sheahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohave, County of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohave County Attorneys Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Lynn Haney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?