Stilwell v. Williams, City of et al

Plaintiff: Ronnie D Stilwell
Defendant: Williams, City of, Joseph Duffy, Lynda Duffy, Raymond Glenn Cornwell and Elsie Cornwell
Case Number: 3:2012cv08053
Filed: March 23, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Prescott Division Office
County: Coconino
Presiding Judge: H Russel Holland
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 9, 2014 180 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 174 Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge H Russel Holland on 7/9/14.(LAD)
April 25, 2014 173 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Defendants' motion 164 for an award of attorneys' fees and related costs is denied. Signed by Judge H Russel Holland on 4/25/2014.(KMG)
March 5, 2014 162 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 145 and 146 defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment and denying 133 plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. The clerk shall enter judgment dismissing plaintiffs' first amended complaint with prejudice. Signed by Judge H Russel Holland on 3/4/14.(LSP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stilwell v. Williams, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronnie D Stilwell
Represented By: Charles Anthony Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Williams, City of
Represented By: Kenneth Harold Brendel
Represented By: Clyde P Halstead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Duffy
Represented By: Kenneth Harold Brendel
Represented By: Clyde P Halstead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynda Duffy
Represented By: Kenneth Harold Brendel
Represented By: Clyde P Halstead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Glenn Cornwell
Represented By: Kenneth Harold Brendel
Represented By: Clyde P Halstead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elsie Cornwell
Represented By: Kenneth Harold Brendel
Represented By: Clyde P Halstead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?