Hamilton v. Yavapai Community College District et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Hamilton
Defendant: Yavapai Community College District, Guidance Academy LLC, John L Stonecipher, Amanda Alsobrook, John Morgan and April Morgan
Movant: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2012cv08193
Filed: September 24, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Office: Prescott Division Office
County: Yavapai
Presiding Judge: Paul G Rosenblatt
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 31 U.S.C. ยง 3729
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 965 ORDER denying 947 Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Summer Violations. FURTHER ORDERED granting 948 Motion to Seal Trial Exhibits 116 and 117. The Clerk of Court is directed to file under seal lodged Doc. 950 . Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 8/19/21. (MAP)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 824 ORDER -IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the NA Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's Ruling, (Doc. 818 ), is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the United States' Motion to Quash (Doc. 775 ) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER OR DERED that the United States' Motion to Strike Defendants North-Aire Aviation, LLC and Justin and Angela Scott's Supplement to their Response to the United State's Motion to Quash (Doc. 795 ) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the NA Defendants' Motion for Leave for the Court to Consider [Doc. 792] (Doc. 798 ) is GRANTED. (See document for further details). Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 4/22/2021. (LAD)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 821 ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the United States Request for VTC Capability for the Appearance of Witness Terry Jarrell is GRANTED. Witness Terry Jarrell may appear via VTC between 8:30 am to 12:00 pm on June 17, 2021. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED t hat the Guidance Defendants' Motion for Additional Time to Present Their Case at Trial (Doc 817 ) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part without prejudice. Defendants are allocated 25 hours to present their case, and the Court removes the ind ividual allocations of time for the Defendants/Counterclaimants. The Defendants must allocate the time between themselves and present their allocations to the Court by Friday, June 4, 2021. (See document for further details). Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 4/19/2021. (LAD)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 819 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the United States shall file a response to Defendants Motion for Reconsideration, (Doc. 818 ), within 7 days of the date of filing of this Order. See document for complete details. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 4/13/2021. (WLP)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 813 ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the United States of America's Motion to Quash Rule 45 Subpoena Issued by Defendants North-Aire Aviation, LLC and Justin and Angela Scott to Former Assistant United States Attorney Lon Leavitt. (Doc. 775 ) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, good cause appearing, Plaintiff-Relator Dan Hamilton's Motion to File Under Seal Doc. 775 -1, (Doc. 793 ) is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court is directed to file under seal Doc. 775 -1 from the public record and file under seal lodged Doc. 794 . (See document for complete details). Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 4/6/21. (SLQ)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 666 ORDER - North-Aire's Request for a Ruling on the Joint Statement of Discovery Dispute (Doc. 248 ) is denied filed in Case No. CV-15-08095-PCT-GMS. See document for complete details. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 8/14/2019. (RMV)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 634 ORDER denying 627 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 12/20/18. (DXD)
April 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 620 ORDER: 457 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is denied; 477 Motion for Summary Judgment is granted in part and denied in part; motions 476 and 489 are granted in part and denied in part. See order for details. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 4/13/2018. (LMR)
October 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 416 ORDER: 1. The Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (Doc. 216 ) is DENIED. 2. The Alternative Motion to Stay the Counterclaims Proceedings (Doc. 216 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 10/7/2016.(KFZ)
September 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 414 ORDER that the Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 189 is DENIED; the Motion to Supplement and Amend/Correct 255 is DENIED; the Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Authority 336 is DENIED; the Motion for Leave to File Surreply 346 is DENIED; and the Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Judgment on the Pleadings 244 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. See attached Order for details. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 9/28/2016.(KFZ)
October 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER - The 135 Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims under A.R.S. § 12-752(A) and Special Motion to Strike Counterclaims Under Cal. Civ. Proc. Code § 425.16 is denied. The 145 Motion to Reconsider Ruling on Scienter and Ruling On Scope of Cl aims under Counts I and II is denied. The United States of America's 147 Statement of Interest on Relator's Motion to Reconsider is construed as a Motion for Clarification and, as such, is granted. The Court clarifies that reckless disreg ard or deliberate indifference not actual knowledge or intent to deceive is sufficient to plead and prove scienter under the FCA. Defendants Guidance Academy and Stoneciphers' 164 Motion to Strike the United States of America's Statemen t of Interest is denied. The 159 Motion to Exceed Page Limit on Reply is granted. The Clerk of the Court is directed to file the Reply on Motion to Dismiss/Strike Counterclaim, lodged at Doc. 160 . Relator-Plaintiff's 167 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Re: Affirmative Defense of Failure to Mitigate Damages Asserted by Yavapai Community College District is denied. (See document for full details.) Signed by Senior Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 10/27/2015. (ATD)
April 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER that the Motion to Dismiss Defendant Guidance Academy, LLC and Motion to Dismiss John L. Stonecipher and Amanda Stonecipher (Alsobrook) (Doc. 94 ) and Yavapai Community College District's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings(Doc. 108 ), in which Morgan Defendants joined (Doc. 118 ), are Granted in part and Denied in part. FURTHER ORDERED that the Motion to Exceed Page Limit in Response to DKT 94 Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 113 ) is Granted. The Clerk of Court is directed to file the d ocument lodged at Doc. 114. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Motion to Exceed Page Limit in Response to Dkt 108 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (Doc. 115 ) is Granted. The Clerk of Court is directed to file the document lodged at Doc. 116. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Yavapai Community College District's Request for Extension of Page Limit for its Reply in Support of the Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (Doc. 124 ) is Granted. The Clerk of Court is directed to file the docu ment lodged at Doc. 125. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Scheduling Conference is reset for Monday, June 1, 2015, at 11:30 a.m., in Courtroom 601 of the Sandra Day O'Connor United States Courthouse, 401 W. Washington Street, Phoenix, Arizona 85003. With this modification of date, all other terms and conditions of the Order Setting Scheduling Conference (Doc. 22 ) remain in full force and effect. Signed by Senior Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 4/1/2015. (See Order for complete details.)(KMG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hamilton v. Yavapai Community College District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Hamilton
Represented By: Krista Michelle Carman
Represented By: Richard James Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yavapai Community College District
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Gilbert
Represented By: Steven Douglas Leach
Represented By: Georgia A Staton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guidance Academy LLC
Represented By: Dan W Goldfine
Represented By: James Michael Gottry
Represented By: Joshua Grabel
Represented By: Donald Charles Zavala, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John L Stonecipher
Represented By: Dan W Goldfine
Represented By: James Michael Gottry
Represented By: Joshua Grabel
Represented By: Donald Charles Zavala, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda Alsobrook
Represented By: Dan W Goldfine
Represented By: James Michael Gottry
Represented By: Joshua Grabel
Represented By: Donald Charles Zavala, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Morgan
Represented By: Jodi Renee Bohr
Represented By: Donald Peder Johnsen
Represented By: Steven Douglas Leach
Represented By: Georgia A Staton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: April Morgan
Represented By: Jodi Renee Bohr
Represented By: Donald Peder Johnsen
Represented By: Steven Douglas Leach
Represented By: Georgia A Staton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: United States of America
Represented By: Todd Frederick Lang(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Represented By: Lon R Leavitt(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?