Begay v. USA

Petitioner: Kenderick Begay
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 3:2012cv08237
Filed: November 28, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Prescott Division Office
County: Navajo
Referring Judge: Michelle H Burns (PS)
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentence
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 9, 2015 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 95 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 6/9/2015.(DGC, nvo)
April 6, 2015 91 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER re: 89 Order - IT IS ORDERED: The Court accepts in part and rejects in part the Original R&R (Doc. 8 ) and accepts the Supplemental R&R (Doc. 77 ) in its entirety. Respondent's motion to strike (Doc. 87 ) is denied. Begay� 39;s motion to vacate (Doc. 111 in CR-06-0626 PCT DGC) is granted. The judgment in CR06-0626 PCT DGC is vacated. Begay is hereby granted a new trial in case number CR06-0626 PCT DGC. (See document for further details, this order originally filed in CR06-0626 PCT DGC). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/31/15. (LAD)
March 31, 2015 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER the Court accepts in part and rejects in part the Original 8 R & R and accepts the Supplemental 77 R & R in its entirety. Respondent's 87 Motion to Strike is denied. Begay's 1 Motion to Vacate ( Doc. 111 in CR-06-0626-PCT-DGC) is granted. The criminal judgment is vacated. Begay is hereby granted a new trial and Attorney Dana Carpenter is appointed to represent Defendant for all further proceedings in the criminal case. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/31/2015.(LFIG)
November 5, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court **ORDER granting 12 Motion to expand the record; denying 14 Motion to expand the record. Case referred to Judge Burns for further consideration.(see order for details). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11/4/2013.(TCA) * Modified on 11/5/2013 to clean up text (TCA).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Begay v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Represented By: Kimberly M Hare
Represented By: Ann Birmingham Scheel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kenderick Begay
Represented By: Daniel R Drake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?