Newman v. Show Low Police Department et al

Plaintiff: Joe Newman
Defendant: Show Low Police Department, Steve Williams, Unknown Spears, Unknown Roby, Unknown Fechtelkotter, Unknown Douglas, Torel Nichols and Unknown McNeil
Case Number: 3:2013cv08005
Filed: January 8, 2013
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Prescott Division Office
County: Apache
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 17, 2015 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 93 Plaintiff's Motion for Waiver of Transcript Fee. See attached Order. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 9/17/2015.(TLB)
May 20, 2015 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED granting Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 76 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment for Defendants and terminate this case. (See document for further details). Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 5/20/15.(LAD)
August 1, 2014 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 63 Defendants' Motion to Strike Plaintiff's "Amended Complaint" filed 7/1/2014 (Doc. 63). FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants shall not file an answer or other responsive pleading to Plaintiff's July 1, 2014 "Amend Complaint" (Doc. 58), which the Court deems not to be an amended complaint. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 7/31/2014.(TLB)
June 26, 2014 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 52 Plaintiffs motion to compel; denying 52 Plaintiffs motion for release of part of the record; denying Plaintiff's 53 second motion to compel; striking 54 Defendants' Answer to Plaintiff's "Amend Complaint" Filed June 11, 2014. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 6/26/2014.(ALS)
April 30, 2014 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - The Court construes Plaintiff's motion as a motion for referral to aMagistrate Judge for a settlement conference. The Court refers parties to a Magistrate Judge only if the request is jointly made. Therefore, ORDERED denying 39 Plaintiff's Motion for Settlement Conference, without prejudice to reurging the motion if both parties agree it would be beneficial. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 4/30/2014.(TLB)
March 25, 2014 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - denying Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel. ORDERED granting 36 Motion to Continue Court Appointed Dates. ORDERED continuing Rule 16 Scheduling Conference from 4/30/2014 to 6/4/2014 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 503, 401 West Washingto n Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Senior Judge James A Teilborg). ORDERED denying 37 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration (docketed as Supplement re: Motion to Continue Court Appointed Dates and Motion to Appoint Counsel). Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 3/25/2014.(TLB)
March 6, 2014 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 29 Defendants' Motion toDismiss; granting 30 Defendant Torel Nichols' Second Motion to Dismiss. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED dismissing with prejudice all claims against Defendants Douglass, McNeil, and Nichols; dismissing with prejudice all claims against Defendants Williams, Fechtelkotter, Spears, and Roby except excessive force. Thus, Plaintiffs sole remaining claims are the excessive force claims against Defendants Williams, Fechtelkotter, Spears, and Roby. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED striking Plaintiff's "Reply to Defendants Counsel Motion to Dismiss" [sic] (Doc. 33 ). Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 3/6/2014. (ALS)
June 10, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 14 Motion to Dismiss; denying 22 Motion for Extension of Time/Third Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying as moot 26 Motion for Hearing or Conference. ORDER that Defendants Show Low Police Department, Steven L. Williams, Jason O Spear, Shawn T. Roby, Cory L. Fechtelkotter, Kenneth E. Douglas, and Jeff McNeil's Joinder in Defendant Torel Nichols' Motion to Dismiss 24 is denied in part and granted in part. ORDER that Defendant Show Low Police Department is dismissed without prejudice because it is a non-jural entity. ORDER that Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint within 20 days of the date of this Order. If Plaintiff fails to comply, this case case will be dismissed with prjudice. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 6/10/13.(TLJ)
January 24, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court *ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk of Court must send Plaintiff a service packet for the Defendant(s). Plaintiff must complete and return the service packet to the Clerk of Court within 30 days of the date of filing of this Order. ORDER denying 3 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 1/24/13.(TLJ) *Modified to reflect defendant(s)on 1/24/2013 (TLJ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Newman v. Show Low Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Show Low Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Spears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Roby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Fechtelkotter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Torel Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown McNeil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?