Pure Wafer Incorporated v. Prescott, City of et al

Plaintiff: Pure Wafer Incorporated
Defendant: Prescott, City of, Marlin Kuykendall, Craig McConnell, Alan Carlow, Jim Lamerson, Steve Blair, Charlie Arnold, Chris Kuknyo, Len Scamardo, Mark Nietupski and Joel Berman
Counter_claimant: Prescott, City of, Steve Blair, Marlin Kuykendall, Alan Carlow, Chris Kuknyo, Charlie Arnold, Joel Berman, Craig McConnell, Len Scamardo, Jim Lamerson and Mark Nietupski
Counter_defendant: Pure Wafer Incorporated
Case Number: 3:2013cv08236
Filed: September 27, 2013
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Prescott Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 31, 2017 148 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Pure Wafer's Motion for Attorneys' Fees, (Doc. 142 ), is GRANTED in the amount of $69,535.62 [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 7/31/17.(MAW)
September 25, 2014 115 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting the City Defendants' Motion for Clarification of Attorneys' Fees Award and Costs Award 111 , which is now a stipulation as follows: Pure Wafer shall collect all awards of attorneys fees and costs from only the City of Prescott. Pure Wafer shall not attempt to collect any such awards from any individual Defendant. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 9/24/2014.(ALS)
September 23, 2014 114 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Defendants' 108 Motion to Stay of Monetary Relief Pending Appeal. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 9/23/2014.(LFIG)
July 29, 2014 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 103 Motion to Strike 102 Addendum. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED striking Doc. 102 . IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees (Doc. 93 ) is granted in part and denied in part. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED awarding Pure Wafer $173,409 in attorneys' fees. (See document for full details). Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 7/29/14. (LAD)
April 17, 2014 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot Pure Wafer's 22 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment for Pure Wafer and against Defendants on Pure Wafer's claims for violations of the Federal Contract Claus e and the State Contract Clause. ORDERED dismissing as moot Pure Wafer's alternative claims for breach of contract and for breach of the implied covenant of good faith and fair dealing. ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment for Pure Wafer and against the City on the City's counterclaim for a declaratory judgment. ORDERED granting Pure Wafer's request for a permanent injunction. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denying the City's request for an award of attorneys' fees and costs. Pure Wafer may move for an award of attorneys' fees and non-taxable costs in accordance with Local Rule of Civil Procedure 54.2. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 4/17/2014. (See Order for details.)(LFIG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pure Wafer Incorporated v. Prescott, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pure Wafer Incorporated
Represented By: Martin A Aronson
Represented By: K Layne Morrill
Represented By: Stephanie Lynn Samuelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prescott, City of
Represented By: Kenneth A Hodson
Represented By: Andrew L Pringle
Represented By: Robert Alan Shull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marlin Kuykendall
Represented By: Kenneth A Hodson
Represented By: Andrew L Pringle
Represented By: Robert Alan Shull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig McConnell
Represented By: Kenneth A Hodson
Represented By: Andrew L Pringle
Represented By: Robert Alan Shull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Carlow
Represented By: Kenneth A Hodson
Represented By: Andrew L Pringle
Represented By: Robert Alan Shull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Lamerson
Represented By: Kenneth A Hodson
Represented By: Andrew L Pringle
Represented By: Robert Alan Shull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Blair
Represented By: Kenneth A Hodson
Represented By: Andrew L Pringle
Represented By: Robert Alan Shull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlie Arnold
Represented By: Kenneth A Hodson
Represented By: Andrew L Pringle
Represented By: Robert Alan Shull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Kuknyo
Represented By: Kenneth A Hodson
Represented By: Andrew L Pringle
Represented By: Robert Alan Shull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Len Scamardo
Represented By: Kenneth A Hodson
Represented By: Andrew L Pringle
Represented By: Robert Alan Shull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Nietupski
Represented By: Kenneth A Hodson
Represented By: Andrew L Pringle
Represented By: Robert Alan Shull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel Berman
Represented By: Kenneth A Hodson
Represented By: Andrew L Pringle
Represented By: Robert Alan Shull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Prescott, City of
Represented By: Kenneth A Hodson
Represented By: Andrew L Pringle
Represented By: Robert Alan Shull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Steve Blair
Represented By: Kenneth A Hodson
Represented By: Andrew L Pringle
Represented By: Robert Alan Shull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Marlin Kuykendall
Represented By: Kenneth A Hodson
Represented By: Andrew L Pringle
Represented By: Robert Alan Shull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Alan Carlow
Represented By: Kenneth A Hodson
Represented By: Andrew L Pringle
Represented By: Robert Alan Shull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Chris Kuknyo
Represented By: Kenneth A Hodson
Represented By: Andrew L Pringle
Represented By: Robert Alan Shull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Charlie Arnold
Represented By: Kenneth A Hodson
Represented By: Andrew L Pringle
Represented By: Robert Alan Shull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Joel Berman
Represented By: Kenneth A Hodson
Represented By: Andrew L Pringle
Represented By: Robert Alan Shull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Craig McConnell
Represented By: Kenneth A Hodson
Represented By: Andrew L Pringle
Represented By: Robert Alan Shull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Len Scamardo
Represented By: Kenneth A Hodson
Represented By: Andrew L Pringle
Represented By: Robert Alan Shull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Jim Lamerson
Represented By: Kenneth A Hodson
Represented By: Andrew L Pringle
Represented By: Robert Alan Shull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Mark Nietupski
Represented By: Kenneth A Hodson
Represented By: Andrew L Pringle
Represented By: Robert Alan Shull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Pure Wafer Incorporated
Represented By: Martin A Aronson
Represented By: K Layne Morrill
Represented By: Stephanie Lynn Samuelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?