Oskowis v. Sedona Oak-Creek Unified School District #9

Plaintiff: Matthew Oskowis
Defendant: Sedona Oak-Creek Unified School District #9
Case Number: 3:2014cv08166
Filed: September 8, 2014
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Prescott Division Office
County: Yavapai
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 20:1401
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 22, 2016 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that District must provide Student with a total of 200 hours of Special Education Services and twelve hours of Occupational Therapy as compensatory education. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, unless both parties otherwise agree, by no later than May 2, 2016, District and Plaintiff shall develop and schedule the implementation of an appropriate, mutually-agreeable academic program that will provide Student with the awarded compensatory education. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that this case is dismissed with prejudice with each party bearing their own attorneys fees and costs incurred herein; and the Clerk of Court shall enter judgment in favor of Plaintiff and against Defendant as to the award of additional hours consistent with this Order. (See document for further details). Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 3/22/16. (LAD)
May 13, 2015 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - ORDERED resetting the briefing schedule as follows: Plaintiff's openingbrief is due 8/17/2015. Defendant's responsive brief is due 9/17/2015. Plaintiff's reply brief is due 10/19/2015. ORDERED denying 28 Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions. ORDERED granting 22 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time. See attached Order. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 5/13/2015.(TLB)
April 21, 2015 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 15 Plaintiff's Motion to Prohibit Spoilage and Preserve Evidence. FURTHER ORDERED that within twenty (20) days from the date of thisOrder, Defendant shall conduct a forensic search of all electronic records within its possession for the e-mail and e-mail attachment identified in Exhibits B and C of Plaintiff's Motion at Doc. [15-2]. See attached Order for details. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 4/21/2015.(TLB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oskowis v. Sedona Oak-Creek Unified School District #9
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Oskowis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sedona Oak-Creek Unified School District #9
Represented By: Patrice M Horstman
Represented By: Samantha Blencke Kelty
Represented By: Eve A Parnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?