Jones v. Bank of America NA et al
Plaintiff: James Jones
Defendant: Bank of America NA, Country Wide Inspection Services, Reverse Mortgage Solutions Incorporated, Luke Adams, Trustee Services of Arizona, Joseph J Tirello, Jr. and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 3:2017cv08231
Filed: November 6, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Office: Prescott Division Office
County: Mohave
Presiding Judge: John J Tuchi
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER granting 68 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. All counts are also dismissed against Defendant Tirello pursuant to his joinder in BANAs motion (Doc. 69). FURTHER ORDERED striking Plaintiffs sur-reply (Doc. 78). Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 7/10/2019. (TCA)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER denying Defendant's 20 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution; granting Defendant's 20 Motion to Quash. Plaintiff has until February 8, 2019 to either (a) properly service BANA, or (b) file a waiver of service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(d). Failure to accomplish either will result in dismissal of BANA as a defendant without further notice. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 12/28/18. (CLB)
December 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting 2 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. ORDERED dismissing Plaintiff's Complaint (Doc. 1 ). FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff may file an Amended Complaint that complies with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure no later than 21 days from the date of this order. If no Amended Complaint is timely filed, the Clerk shall dismiss this action without further Order of the Court. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 12/8/17. (EJA)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Bank of America NA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Country Wide Inspection Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reverse Mortgage Solutions Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luke Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trustee Services of Arizona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph J Tirello, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?