Eppler et al v. Ryan
Plaintiff: Chad A Coker, Anthony Gaines, Robert Sedova, Randolph Jackson, Roy B Ballard, James Dover, Harvey Ullrich, Shawn A Kolden, Brandon Berry, Jared Edwards, Christopher Ross, Frank Eppler, Darron Robertson, Marshon Osterhout, Matthew Johnson, Jeff Bacon, Darin R Manning, Michael T Johnson, Henry Lane, Toby Gaspard, Dwaunique Tremble, Devin Erskin, Benjamin Watkins, John C Stuart, Casey Henke, Chris Baldwin, Russell Debord, David Paulson, Toby Hetland, Anthony Tatarelli, Ervin L Jones, Unknown Young, G Wheaton, Christopher Frazen and Ira Deland Evans
Defendant: Charles L Ryan
Case Number: 3:2018cv08229
Filed: September 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Deborah M Fine (PS)
Referring Judge: Susan R Bolton
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2018 Filing 10 CLERK'S JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that pursuant to the Court's Order filed October 17, 2018, judgment of dismissal is entered. Plaintiffs to take nothing, and the complaint and action are dismissed without prejudice. (DXD)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Plaintiff Eppler's Motion to Dismiss and denying as moot #3 Plaintiff Eppler's Motion to Appoint Counsel. This case is severed into individual actions, one for each Plaintiff except Plaintiff Eppler. The Clerk shall assign a new case number to each new individual action, close this case (CV 18-08229-PCT-SRB (DMF)) and enter judgment accordingly. The Clerk shall not file the lodged Orders (Docs. #4 and #5 ). The Clerk shall file a copy of the Complaint (Doc. #1 ) and this Order in each new case. The rulings in this Order shall apply in each new case. The individual Plaintiffs must proceed independently from this point and will not be regarded as co-plaintiffs, except upon further order of the Court. See Order for further details. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 10/17/18. (DXD)
October 9, 2018 Filing 8 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Christopher Frazen. Reason for return: Forwarded to ASPC Eyman/Not at ASCP Eyman. Document number #6 . (DXD)
September 26, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Frank Eppler. (SLQ)(2 pages). *Modified to correct filers on 10/16/2018 (DXD).
September 19, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT: (DXD)
September 19, 2018 Filing 5 *LODGED Proposed Order. Document to be filed by Clerk if Leave to File is granted. Filed by Jeff Bacon, Chris Baldwin, Roy B Ballard, Brandon Berry, Chad A Coker, Russell Debord, James Dover, Jared Edwards, Frank Eppler, Devin Erskin, Ira Deland Evans, Christopher Frazen, Anthony Gaines, Toby Gaspard, Casey Henke, Toby Hetland, Randolph Jackson, Matthew Johnson, Michael T Johnson, Ervin L Jones, Shawn A Kolden, Henry Lane, Darin R Manning, Marshon Osterhout, David Paulson, Darron Robertson, Christopher Ross, Robert Sedova, John C Stuart, Anthony Tatarelli, Dwaunique Tremble, Harvey Ullrich, Benjamin Watkins, G Wheaton, Unknown Young (3 page). (DXD) Modified on 10/17/2018 (DXD).
September 19, 2018 Filing 4 *LODGED Proposed Order to Show Cause for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order. Document to be filed by Clerk if Leave to File is granted. Filed by Jeff Bacon, Chris Baldwin, Roy B Ballard, Brandon Berry, Chad A Coker, Russell Debord, James Dover, Jared Edwards, Frank Eppler, Devin Erskin, Ira Deland Evans, Christopher Frazen, Anthony Gaines, Toby Gaspard, Casey Henke, Toby Hetland, Randolph Jackson, Matthew Johnson, Michael T Johnson, Ervin L Jones, Shawn A Kolden, Henry Lane, Darin R Manning, Marshon Osterhout, David Paulson, Darron Robertson, Christopher Ross, Robert Sedova, John C Stuart, Anthony Tatarelli, Dwaunique Tremble, Harvey Ullrich, Benjamin Watkins, G Wheaton, Unknown Young (2 pages). (DXD) Modified on 10/17/2018 (DXD).
September 19, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Frank Eppler (3 pages). (DXD) *Modified to correct filers on 10/16/2018 (DXD).
September 19, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Jeff Bacon, Chris Baldwin, Roy B Ballard, Brandon Berry, Chad A Coker, Russell Debord, James Dover, Jared Edwards, Frank Eppler, Devin Erskin, Ira Deland Evans, Christopher Frazen, Anthony Gaines, Toby Gaspard, Casey Henke, Toby Hetland, Randolph Jackson, Matthew Johnson, Michael T Johnson, Ervin L Jones, Shawn A Kolden, Henry Lane, Darin R Manning, Marshon Osterhout, David Paulson, Darron Robertson, Christopher Ross, Robert Sedova, John C Stuart, Anthony Tatarelli, Dwaunique Tremble, Harvey Ullrich, Benjamin Watkins, G Wheaton, Unknown Young (1 page). (DXD)
September 19, 2018 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed by Unknown Young, Anthony Tatarelli, Toby Hetland, Roy B Ballard, Brandon Berry, John C Stuart, Toby Gaspard, Frank Eppler, Robert Sedova, G Wheaton, Shawn A Kolden, Ervin L Jones, Randolph Jackson, Darron Robertson, Harvey Ullrich, David Paulson, Anthony Gaines, Christopher Ross, Michael T Johnson, Dwaunique Tremble, Chad A Coker, Chris Baldwin, Ira Deland Evans, Henry Lane, Devin Erskin, Matthew Johnson, Christopher Frazen, Russell Debord, Jared Edwards, Darin R Manning, James Dover, Jeff Bacon, Marshon Osterhout, Casey Henke, Benjamin Watkins (22 pages). (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(DXD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eppler et al v. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad A Coker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Gaines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Sedova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randolph Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy B Ballard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Dover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harvey Ullrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn A Kolden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Berry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jared Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Eppler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darron Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marshon Osterhout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Bacon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darin R Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael T Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Toby Gaspard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dwaunique Tremble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Devin Erskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John C Stuart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Casey Henke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell Debord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Paulson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Toby Hetland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Tatarelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ervin L Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Unknown Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G Wheaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Frazen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ira Deland Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles L Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?