Krasemann et al v. Scholastic Incorporated

Plaintiff: Daniel R Krasemann, Johnny Johnson, Darrell Gulin and Stephen Krasemann
Defendant: Scholastic Incorporated
Case Number: 3:2018cv08313
Filed: November 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Dominic W Lanza
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PRELIMINARY ORDER: IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED: 1. That Plaintiff(s) must promptly serve a copy of this Order and its Attachments on Defendant(s) and file notice of service with the Clerk of Court; 2. That, unless the Court orders otherwise, on February 5, 2019, the Clerk of Court shall terminate without further notice any Defendant in this action that has not been served pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure; 3. That, unless the Court orders otherwise, the parties shall file with the Clerk of Court a notice of service of MIDP Responses, supplemental MIDP Responses, and production of ESI, rather than copies of the actual disclosures [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 11/21/18. (Attachments: #1 Notice MIDP, #2 MIDP User Manual)(MAW)
November 14, 2018 Filing 8 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Darrell Gulin, Johnny Johnson, Daniel R Krasemann, Stephen Krasemann: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 11/08/2018 to Scholastic Inc. . (Bruss, Amanda)
November 8, 2018 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Christopher Seidman on behalf of plaintiff. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
November 7, 2018 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Amanda Bruss on behalf of plaintiffs. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
November 7, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Darrell Gulin, Johnny Johnson, Daniel R Krasemann, Stephen Krasemann. (Bruss, Amanda)
November 7, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (KEP)
November 7, 2018 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading (KEP)
November 7, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Scholastic Incorporated. (KEP). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
November 6, 2018 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16168188. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Dominic W. Lanza. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-18-8313-PCT-DWL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (KEP)
November 6, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Darrell Gulin, Johnny Johnson, Daniel R Krasemann, Stephen Krasemann. (Bruss, Amanda) (KEP)
November 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16168188 filed by Stephen Krasemann, Daniel R Krasemann, Johnny Johnson, Darrell Gulin. (Bruss, Amanda) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(KEP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Krasemann et al v. Scholastic Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel R Krasemann
Represented By: Christopher Seidman
Represented By: Amanda L Bruss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny Johnson
Represented By: Christopher Seidman
Represented By: Amanda L Bruss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrell Gulin
Represented By: Christopher Seidman
Represented By: Amanda L Bruss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Krasemann
Represented By: Christopher Seidman
Represented By: Amanda L Bruss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scholastic Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?