Ree v. Ryan et al
Plaintiff: John Francis Ree, Jr.
Defendant: Richard Pratt, Charles L Ryan, Dennis Randles, Rick Morales, Unknown Wallace, Sirena Tracas, Michael Brathwaite, Elijah Jordan and Sheila Feldman
Case Number: 3:2018cv08348
Filed: December 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: John Z Boyle (PS)
Referring Judge: Steven P Logan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE- Order to Show Cause for a Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order by John Francis Ree, Jr. (3 pages) (MSA)
January 22, 2019 Filing 12 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by John Francis Ree, Jr. (10 pages) (MSA)
January 22, 2019 Filing 11 DECLARATION of in Support of #10 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Plaintiff John Francis Ree, Jr. (3 pages) (MSA)
January 22, 2019 Filing 10 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by John Francis Ree, Jr. (2 pages) (MSA)
January 22, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM of Law by Plaintiff John Francis Ree, Jr. (6 pages) (MSA)
January 22, 2019 Filing 8 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by John Francis Ree, Jr. (24 pages)(MSA)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - Plaintiff's #3 motion for a 30-day extension of time in which to file an Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is granted. Within 30 days of the date this Order is filed, Plaintiff must either pay the $350.00 filing fee and $50.00 administrative fee or file a complete Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and a certified six-month trust account statement. If Plaintiff fails to comply, the Clerk of Court must enter a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice and without further notice to Plaintiff and deny any pending unrelated motions as moot. Plaintiff's #2 motion for appointment of counsel is denied. The #1 Complaint is dismissed for failure to state a claim. Plaintiff has 30 days from the date this Order is filed to file a first amended complaint in compliance with this Order. If Plaintiff fails to comply, the Clerk of Court must, without further notice, enter a judgment of dismissal of this action with prejudice that states that the dismissal may count as a "strike" under 28 U.S.C. 1915(g) and deny any pending unrelated motions as moot. See document for complete details. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 12/14/18. (MSA)
December 13, 2018 Filing 6 Amended Notice of Assignment. (BAS)
December 12, 2018 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER: A clerical error having been made at case assignment, this matter is randomly reassigned to the Honorable Steven P. Logan. All future filings shall reflect the following case number: CV-18-08348-PCT-SPL (JZB). Pending: Plaintiff's Motion for Court Appointed Counsel (Doc. #2 ) and motion for extension of time to file IFP (Doc. #3 ). This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NKS)
December 10, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT: (SLQ)
December 10, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File IFP by John Francis Ree, Jr. (SLQ) (1 page)
December 10, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by John Francis Ree, Jr. (SLQ) (2 pages).
December 10, 2018 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed by John Francis Ree, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(SLQ) (7 pages, plus envelope).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ree v. Ryan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Francis Ree, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles L Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Randles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sirena Tracas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Brathwaite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elijah Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheila Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?