Chisholm v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration

Plaintiff: Jason Chisholm
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2019cv08010
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Margaret Lehrkind appearing for Commissioner of Social Security Administration. . (Lehrkind, Margaret)
January 15, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
January 14, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Submitted by Jason Chisholm. (Phillips, John)
January 14, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #3 Summons Submitted filed by Jason Chisholm. Summons missing attorney information on bottom of form. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile corrected document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re: #2 Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in District Court WithoutPrepaying Fees or Costs. IT IS ORDERED GRANTING the application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. #2 ), without prepayment of costs or fees or the necessity of giving security therefor. Plaintiff shall be responsible for service of the summons and complaint. Signed by Senior Judge James A. Teilborg on 1/11/2019. (RMW)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER issued. See Order for deadlines and details. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 1/11/19. (SJF)
January 10, 2019 Filing 4 This case has been assigned to the Honorable James A Teilborg. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-8010-PCT-JAT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MFR)
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Jason Chisholm. (Phillips, John) (MFR)
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Jason Chisholm. (Phillips, John)(MFR)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Jason Chisholm. (Phillips, John) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Federal Fee Agreement, #3 Affidavit Assignment of EAJA Fee)(MFR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chisholm v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Chisholm
Represented By: John E Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Represented By: Margaret Thompson Lehrkind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?