Salt v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Jayne Salt
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2019cv08029
Filed: January 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Dominic W Lanza
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2019 Filing 8 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Jayne Salt: Notice of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Preliminary Order, Notice to Parties of MIDP, Mandatory Initial Discovery Users' Manual for the District of Arizona upon Acting United States Attorney Elizabeth A. Strange on 2/5/19, Attorney General for the United States on 2/5/19, Department of Health and Human Services on 2/12/19. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit to Cert of Service)(Borg, Scott) *Modified text dates on 2/20/2019 (DXD).
February 11, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Scott E Borg on behalf of plaintiff. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PRELIMINARY ORDER: IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED: 1. That Plaintiff(s) must promptly serve a copy of this Order and its Attachments on Defendant(s) and file notice of service with the Clerk of Court; 2. That, unless the Court orders otherwise, on April 30, 2019, the Clerk of Court shall terminate without further notice any Defendant in this action that has not been served pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure; 3. That, unless the Court orders otherwise, the parties shall file with the Clerk of Court a notice of service of MIDP Responses, supplemental MIDP Responses, and production of ESI, rather than copies of the actual disclosures [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 1/30/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice - MIDP, #2 MIDP User Manual)(MAW)
January 29, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Jayne Salt. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SIB)
January 29, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(SIB). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
January 29, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (SIB)
January 29, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16466223. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Dominic W Lanza. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 19-8029-PCT-DWL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (SIB)
January 29, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Jayne Salt. (Borg, Scott) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(SIB)
January 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16466223 filed by Jayne Salt. (Borg, Scott) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SIB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salt v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jayne Salt
Represented By: Scott Eugene Borg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?