Buonarigo v. BJ's Tavern LLC

Plaintiff: Anthony Buonarigo
Defendant: BJ's Tavern LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv08037
Filed: February 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2019 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Anthony Buonarigo.(Benedetto, Stephen)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting the parties' stipulation (Doc. #11 ) such that Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint by 3/29/2019. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the amended complaint by 4/8/2019. If Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint by 3/29/2019, Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by 4/3/2019. Signed by Senior Judge James A. Teilborg on 3/25/2019. (RMW)
March 25, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE re: of Stipulation for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Anthony Buonarigo . (Benedetto, Stephen)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re: #9 Supplement: The Court finds jurisdiction has now been pleaded. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that the Court will take no further action regarding jurisdiction, without prejudice to Defendant raising any jurisdictional issues it deems appropriate. Signed by Senior Judge James A. Teilborg on 3/14/2019. (RMW)
March 13, 2019 Filing 9 SUPPLEMENT Supplement re: Jurisdiction re: #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Anthony Buonarigo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Stephen D. Benedetto)(Benedetto, Stephen)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that by 3/20/2019, Plaintiff shall file a supplement to the complaint properly alleging federal subject matter jurisdiction, or this case will be dismissed without prejudice for lack of federal subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Senior Judge James A. Teilborg on 3/13/2019. (RMW)
March 11, 2019 Filing 7 *SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Anthony Buonarigo: Certificate of Service re: Summons and Complaint upon Bj's Tavern on 03/04/2019. (Benedetto, Stephen) *Modified to correct documents served on 3/12/2019 (REK).
February 25, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to BJ's Tavern LLC. (BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
February 22, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Submitted by Anthony Buonarigo. (Benedetto, Stephen)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDARD CIVIL TRACK INITIAL ORDER: Plaintiff(s) shall effect service of the Complaint and Summons upon all Defendants no later than 90 days after the filing of the Complaint. The parties must comply with Gen. Ord. No. 17- 08 (D. Ariz. Apr. 14, 2017) regarding the mandatory initial discovery responses. Full compliance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 (filing of a Corporate Disclosure Statement) is required by plaintiff(s) and defendant(s), if applicable. Plaintiff shall serve Defendant(s) with a copy of this Order. See document for further details. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 2/07/2019. (REK)
February 7, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MFR)
February 6, 2019 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16504433. This case has been assigned to the Honorable James A Teilborg. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-8037-PCT-JAT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MFR)
February 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16504433 filed by Anthony Buonarigo. (Benedetto, Stephen) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MFR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buonarigo v. BJ's Tavern LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Buonarigo
Represented By: Heather Ann Hamel
Represented By: Stephen Dominic Benedetto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BJ's Tavern LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?