Hougas v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Kenneth Paul Hougas
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2019cv08039
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Steven P Logan
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Wyeth McAdam appearing for Commissioner of Social Security Administration. . (McAdam, S)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: Opening brief is due 60 days after answer is filed. Answering brief is due 30 days after service of opening brief. Reply brief is due 15 days after service of answering brief. See order for additional details. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 2/12/2019. (LMR)
February 8, 2019 Filing 6 *Entry filed in the incorrect case. All docket text associated with the entry has been removed on 2/8/2019 (SCH).
February 8, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(MCO). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
February 8, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16510234. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Steven P Logan. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV19-8039-PCT-SPL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MCO)
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Kenneth Paul Hougas. (Reissner, Joel) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(MCO)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16510234 filed by Kenneth Paul Hougas. (Reissner, Joel) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MCO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hougas v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Paul Hougas
Represented By: Joel Newell Reissner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Represented By: S Wyeth McAdam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?