Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation v. Tates Automotive Incorporated et al

Plaintiff: Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation
Defendant: Tates Automotive Incorporated, Linda L Tate and Richard K Berry
Case Number: 3:2019cv08068
Filed: March 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Steven P Logan
Referring Judge: Neil V Wake
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER - This action is stayed pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 362(a) as to Defendant Tates Automotive Inc. but shall be dismissed without further notice on June 12, 2019, unless prior thereto, a motion to continue the stay is filed or the Court is advised that the bankruptcy stay has been lifted and the parties are ready to proceed with this case. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 3/15/19. (MSA)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying #9 Plaintiff's Motion for Writ of Replevin or, In The Alternative "Injuncative" Relief. [See attached order for additional information.] Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 3/14/2019. (RMW)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER that a motion pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) is discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motion to determine whether it can be avoided. That Plaintiff(s) must file proof of service of the summons and complaint or of waiver of service with the Clerk of Court no later than June 5, 2019. Plaintiff(s) must promptly serve a copy of this Order and its Attachments on Defendant(s) and file notice of service with the Clerk of Court. Unless the Court orders otherwise, on June 5, 2019, the Clerk of Court shall terminate without further notice any Defendant in this action that has not been served pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 3/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(LMR)
March 11, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF FILING BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record as to Tate's Automotive, Inc by Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation. (Harnisch, Andrew)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER - I hereby recuse myself from any further action in the above- captioned matter. IT IS ORDERED this case be reassigned, by lot, to another Judge in the District ofArizona. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this matter has been reassigned by random lot to the Honorable Steven P. Logan. All future pleadings and papers submitted for filing shall bear the following complete case number: CV-19-08068-PCT-SPL. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 3/11/19. (SLQ)
March 8, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Jeff Griffin In Support of Motion for Writ of Replevin or, in the Alternative, Injunctive Relief, #2 Exhibit Affidavit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Affidavit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Affidavit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Affidavit Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit Affidavit Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit Affidavit Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit Affidavit Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit Affidavit Exhibit H, #10 Text of Proposed Order Proposed TRO Order, #11 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Replevin Order)(Harnisch, Andrew)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER/NOTICE PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 4(m) - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on June 5, 2019. See document for complete details. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 3/8/19. (MSA)
March 7, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER: A clerical error having been made at case assignment, this matter is randomly reassigned to Chief Judge G. Murray Snow. All future filings shall reflect the following complete case number: CV-19-08068-PCT-GMS. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NKS)
March 6, 2019 Filing 6 *NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (DLC) *NEF regenerated on 3/7/2019 (CEI).
March 6, 2019 Filing 5 *Summons Issued as to Richard K Berry, Linda L Tate, Tates Automotive Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(DLC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. *NEF regenerated on 3/7/2019 (CEI).
March 6, 2019 Filing 4 *Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16617998. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Senior Judge Neil V Wake. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-8068-PCT-NVW. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (DLC) *NEF regenerated on 3/7/2019 (CEI).
March 6, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation. (Harnisch, Andrew) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(DLC)
March 6, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation. (Harnisch, Andrew) (DLC)
March 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (TRO Requested). Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16617998 filed by Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation. (Harnisch, Andrew) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M)(DLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation v. Tates Automotive Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tates Automotive Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda L Tate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard K Berry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation
Represented By: Duane M Geck
Represented By: Andrew Anthony Harnisch
Represented By: Donald H Cram, III
Represented By: Jesse Rowley Callahan
Represented By: Andrew S Elliot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?