Chee et al v. Ethicon Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Elouise N Chee and Jimmie Leo Chee
Defendant: Ethicon Incorporated and Johnson & Johnson Incorporated
Case Number: 3:2019cv08135
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Diane J Humetewa
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Filing 17 Ethicon, Inc. ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Ethicon Incorporated.(Johnston, Bradley)
June 25, 2019 Filing 16 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Elouise N Chee, Jimmie Leo Chee: Affidavit of Service re: AO440 Summons in a Civil Action upon Ethicon, Inc. d/b/a Ethicon Women's Health and Urology on 06/13/2019. (Przybysz, Eric)
June 11, 2019 Filing 15 *WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT re: #8 Service Executed by Plaintiffs Elouise N Chee, Jimmie Leo Chee. (McCarley, Matthew) *Modified to correct event on 6/12/2019 (GMP).
June 10, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #13 Answer to Complaint filed by Johnson & Johnson Incorporated. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. Please do not refile. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LAD)
June 10, 2019 Filing 13 * Johnson & Johnson ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Johnson & Johnson Incorporated.(Johnston, Bradley) * Document not in compliance with Local Rule. Modified to add additional counsel; attorney noticed on 6/11/2019 (LAD).
June 10, 2019 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Ethicon Incorporated. (BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
June 7, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Submitted by Elouise N Chee, Jimmie Leo Chee. (Przybysz, Eric)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: A Scheduling Conference is set for 8/9/2019 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 605, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Diane J Humetewa. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this order upon Defendant and file notice of service. (See Order for details) Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 5/24/19. (CLB)
May 24, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Martin Przybysz on behalf of Elouise N Chee, Jimmie Leo Chee. (Przybysz, Eric)
May 24, 2019 Filing 8 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Elouise N Chee, Jimmie Leo Chee: Certificate of Service re: AO440 Summons in a Civil Action upon Ethicon, Inc. d/b/a Ethicon Women's Health and Urology on 05/22/2019. (McCarley, Matthew)
May 24, 2019 Filing 7 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Elouise N Chee, Jimmie Leo Chee: Proof of Service re: AO440 Summons in a Civil Action upon Johnson & Johnson, Inc. on 05/21/2019. (McCarley, Matthew)
May 14, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Matthew R McCarley on behalf of plaintiffs. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 5/9/19. (LAD)
May 8, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Ethicon Incorporated, Johnson & Johnson Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(BAR). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
May 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (BAR)
May 8, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16886715. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Diane J Humetewa. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: 3:19-cv-08135. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (BAR)
May 8, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Elouise N Chee, Jimmie Leo Chee. (McCarley, Matthew) (Attachments: #1 Summons)(BAR)
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16886715 filed by Elouise N Chee, Jimmie Leo Chee. (McCarley, Matthew) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BAR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chee et al v. Ethicon Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elouise N Chee
Represented By: Matthew Ryan McCarley
Represented By: Eric Martin Przybysz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmie Leo Chee
Represented By: Matthew Ryan McCarley
Represented By: Eric Martin Przybysz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon Incorporated
Represented By: Levi Trent Claridge
Represented By: Bradley James Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Incorporated
Represented By: Levi Trent Claridge
Represented By: Bradley James Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?