Hiduchick v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Heather Angel Hiduchick
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2019cv08179
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Susan M Brnovich
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2019 Filing 9 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Heather Angel Hiduchick: Notice of Service re: Summons upon William Barr, US Attorney General (07/24/19); Andrew M. Saul, Commissioner of the Social Security Administration (07/22/19); Elizabeth Strange, First Assistant US Attorney for the District of Arizona (07/19/19). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Domestic return receipts and certified mail receipts)(Caldwell, Mark) *Modified text on 7/30/2019 (DXD).
July 25, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Carol Clark appearing for Commissioner of Social Security Administration. . (Clark, Carol)
July 18, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(BAS)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 7/17/2019. (TCA)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: Parties must fully comply with the deadlines and procedures. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 6/18/2019. (TCA)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 This case has been assigned to the Honorable Susan M Brnovich. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-08179-PCT-SMB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (KAH)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Heather Angel Hiduchick. (Caldwell, Mark) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons) (KAH)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Heather Angel Hiduchick. (Caldwell, Mark) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (KAH)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Heather Angel Hiduchick. (Caldwell, Mark) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (KAH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hiduchick v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Angel Hiduchick
Represented By: Mark Ross Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Represented By: Carol Sue Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?