Burdette v. Mohave County Superior Court et al
Petitioner: Jason Wesley Burdette
Respondent: James M Schoppmann and Mohave County Superior Court
Case Number: 3:2019cv08198
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Camille D Bibles (PS)
Referring Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Filing 10 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Jason Wesley Burdette. (SST) (2 pages)
August 23, 2019 Filing 9 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Jason Wesley Burdette. (SST) (2 pages)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - Petitioner's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Doc. #6 ) is denied. Within 30 days of the date this Order is filed, Petitioner must either pay the $5.00 filing fee or file a complete Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. If Petitioner fails to either pay the $5.00 filing fee or file a complete Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis within 30 days, the Clerk of Court must enter a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice and without further notice to Petitioner and deny any pending unrelated motions as moot. The Clerk of Court must mail Petitioner a court-approved form for filing an Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Habeas). See document for complete details. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 8/21/2019. (RMV)
August 12, 2019 Filing 7 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Jason Wesley Burdette. (2 pages) (MSA)
August 12, 2019 Filing 6 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Jason Wesley Burdette. (2 pages) (MSA)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - Petitioner's #2 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is denied. Within 30 days of the date this Order is filed, Petitioner must either pay the $5.00 filing fee or file a complete Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. If Petitioner fails to comply, the Clerk of Court must enter a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice and without further notice to Petitioner and deny any pending unrelated motions as moot. See document for complete details. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 7/24/19. (MSA)
July 9, 2019 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Jason Wesley Burdette. ( 1 page) (MSA)
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (MSA)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Jason Wesley Burdette. (1 page) (MSA)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Fed/2241) filed by James M Schoppmann, Mohave County Superior Court. (8 pages) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MSA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burdette v. Mohave County Superior Court et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: James M Schoppmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mohave County Superior Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jason Wesley Burdette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?