Nez v. American Family Mutual Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Victoria Nez
Defendant: American Family Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv08200
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Victoria Nez. (Jordan, David)
August 21, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant American Family Mutual Insurance Company. (Sayre, Kimberly)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Due to a conflict in the Court's calendar, IT IS ORDERED the Scheduling Conference, presently set for 9/20/19 at 10:00 a.m. is VACATED and RESET. Scheduling Conference set for 9/27/19 at 11:15 a.m. in Courtroom 602, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. Ordered by Chief Judge G Murray Snow. (GMS, ag) ( This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE for 9/20/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 602, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. See document for details. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 7/19/19. (EJA)
July 19, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by American Family Mutual Insurance Company.(Sayre, Kimberly)
July 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly Jean Sayre on behalf of American Family Mutual Insurance Company. (Sayre, Kimberly)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MCO)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17155257. This case has been assigned to the Honorable G Murray Snow. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-8200-PCT-GMS. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MCO)
July 12, 2019 ***STATE COURT RECORDS RECEIVED***SERVICE EXECUTED : Proof of Service re: Summons/Lawsuit and other court papers upon American Family Mutual Insurance Company on 6/12/2019. (MCO) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Family Mutual Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent American Family Mutual Insurance Company SI, Corporate Parent AmFam Holdings Incorporated for American Family Mutual Insurance Company. (Allen, Lynn) (MCO)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Coconino County Superior Court, case number S0300CV201900265. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17155257 filed by American Family Mutual Insurance Company. 0970-17155257 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(MCO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nez v. American Family Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Family Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Lynn M Allen
Represented By: Kimberly Jean Sayre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria Nez
Represented By: David Robert Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?