Cassell v. Lotus Garden Restaurant Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Kimberly Cassell
Defendant: Unknown Parties and Lotus Garden Restaurant Incorporated
Case Number: 3:2019cv08205
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Dominic W Lanza
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 4/3/2020. Dispositive motions due by 8/28/2020 [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 8/27/19. (MAW)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: The Court, having reviewed the parties' joint Rule 26(f) report (Doc. #12 ), concludes it is unnecessary to hold a Rule 16 Case Management Conference. Accordingly, the Rule 16 Case Management Conference set on August 30, 2019, is vacated. The Court will separately issue the Case Management Order. Counsel are to note at Item 11 of the Case Management Order that the deadlines are real, and the Court will enforce the deadlines set forth in the Order. The parties should plan their litigation activities accordingly. Ordered by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 8/27/19. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAW)
August 24, 2019 Filing 12 Rule 26(f) Report for Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Kimberly Cassell. (Favors, Melina)
August 14, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Kimberly Cassell. (Favors, Melina)
August 14, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Kimberly Cassell. (Favors, Melina)
August 14, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) Defendant's Response to Mandatory Discovery Request filed by Defendant Lotus Garden Restaurant Incorporated. (Pyburn, Jeffrey)
July 17, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lotus Garden Restaurant Incorporated. (Pyburn, Jeffrey)
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Lotus Garden Restaurant Incorporated. (Pyburn, Jeffrey)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Pursuant to Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, a Case Management Conference is set for August 30, 2019, at 10:00 a.m., in Courtroom 601, Sandra Day O'Connor U.S. Federal Courthouse, 401 W. Washington St., Phoenix, Arizona 85003-2151 [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 7/16/19. (MAW)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRELIMINARY ORDER [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 7/16/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice - MIDP, #2 MIDP User Manual)(MAW)
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Lotus Garden Restaurant Incorporated. (ARC)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ARC)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17161842. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Dominic W Lanza. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-8205-PCT-DWL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (ARC)
July 15, 2019 ***STATE COURT RECORD RECEIVED*** SERVICE EXECUTED: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver signed on 5/2/2019 by Lotus Garden Restaurant Incorporated. ENTERED IN DISTRICT COURT FOR CASE MANAGEMENT PURPOSES*** (ARC) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
July 15, 2019 ***STATE COURT RECORD RECEIVED: ANSWER to Complaint by Lotus Garden Restaurant Incorporated. ENTERED IN DISTRICT COURT FOR CASE MANAGEMENT PURPOSES*** (ARC)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Navajo County Superior Court, case number S0900CV201900175. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17161842 filed by Lotus Garden Restaurant Incorporated. (Pyburn, Jeffrey) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Index of Exhibits, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G, #11 Exhibit H)(ARC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cassell v. Lotus Garden Restaurant Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lotus Garden Restaurant Incorporated
Represented By: Jeffrey Thomas Pyburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Cassell
Represented By: Melina Detiste Favors
Represented By: Mark Joseph Bourassa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?