Duke v. Ryan et al
Plaintiff: Brent Fitzgerald Duke
Defendant: Charles L Ryan and Attorney General of the State of Arizona
Case Number: 3:2019cv08209
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: James F Metcalf (PS)
Referring Judge: John J Tuchi
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE to Petition of Forfeiture of Bond Proceeding as an Answer to the Respondent Complaint Against Forfeiture of Bond Order by Plaintiff Brent Fitzgerald Duke. (13 pages) (REK)
August 26, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Order of all Exhibits by Brent Fitzgerald Duke. (2 pages) (REK)
August 26, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Telephonic Deposition of Respondents, filed by Brent Fitzgerald Duke. (4 pages) (REK)
August 26, 2019 Filing 15 Petitioner's Disclosure by Brent Fitzgerald Duke. (4 pages) (REK)
August 26, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Briefing Uncertified Issues and Order "Certified Issues" Briefed by Brent Fitzgerald Duke. (10 pages) (REK)
August 19, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Investigator by Brent Fitzgerald Duke (52 pages). (DXD)
August 5, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Bond Reduction or Forfeiture of Bond by Brent Fitzgerald Duke. (8 pages) (RMV)
August 5, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Suit by Brent Fitzgerald Duke. (4 pages) (RMV)
August 5, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Issuance of Subpoenas by Brent Fitzgerald Duke. (4 pages) (RMV)
August 5, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE in Revised Model of Arizona Risk Management Administrative Procedure Act of (1961) with Petitioner's Notice of Claim Against the State of Arizona by Brent Fitzgerald Duke. (7 pages) (RMV)
August 5, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Order of Subpoenas, and/or in the alternative, MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Brent Fitzgerald Duke. (5 pages) (RMV)
August 5, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Order for Reimbursement of Appointed Counsel's Fees by Brent Fitzgerald Duke. (6 pages) (RMV)
August 5, 2019 Filing 6 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Brent Fitzgerald Duke. (13 pages) (RMV)
August 5, 2019 Filing 5 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Brent Fitzgerald Duke. (2 pages) (RMV)
August 5, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF PARTY'S CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Brent Fitzgerald Duke: #060858, ASPC Tucson - Cimarron Unit, PO Box 24409, Tucson, AZ 85734. (RMV)
July 18, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE: This case is subject to electronic filing. Please review the attached documents. (DXD)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (DXD)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State/2254) filed by Brent Fitzgerald Duke (44 pages).(DXD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duke v. Ryan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles L Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General of the State of Arizona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brent Fitzgerald Duke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?