Bullock v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Candas Bullock
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2019cv08217
Filed: July 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Diane J Humetewa
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER setting a Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 10/29/2019 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 605, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Diane J Humetewa. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 8/26/2019. (See Order for details.) (LFIG)
August 23, 2019 Filing 8 *SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Candas Bullock: Certificate of Mailing re: #6 Order, dated July 23, 2019 upon United States of America via Civil Processing Clerk, US Attorney's Office on 08/14/19 and United States Attorney General on 08/19/19. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order, dated July 23, 2019)(Jordan, David) *Modified to create document link and add parties served on 8/23/2019 (REK).
August 23, 2019 Filing 7 *SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Candas Bullock: Notice of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Notice to parties -Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project upon United States of America via Civil Processing Clerk, U.S. Attorney's Office on 07/26/19 and United States Attorney General 07/29/19. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit USPS Certified Return Receipts)(Jordan, David) *Modified to list parties served on 8/23/2019 (REK).
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff serve a copy of this Order upon Defendants who have not yet appeared and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 7/23/19. (CLB)
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (KEP)
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to United States of America. (KEP). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
July 21, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17185411. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Diane J. Humetewa. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-8217-PCT-DJH. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (KEP)
July 21, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Candas Bullock. (Jordan, David) (KEP)
July 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17185411 filed by Candas Bullock. (Jordan, David) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(KEP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bullock v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candas Bullock
Represented By: David Robert Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?