Schisel v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Micah Schisel
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2019cv08235
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Diane J Humetewa
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE re: Notice of Service by Micah Schisel Re: Order, Notice to Parties- Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project, General Order 17-08 and MIDP Project Checklist. (Kille, Mark)
September 23, 2019 Filing 8 * SERVICE EXECUTED/Notice of Service of Defendant by certified mail service upon US Attorney, District of Arizona, on 9/4/19 by Micah Schisel . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Service)(Kille, Mark) * Modified to correct event; attorney noticed on 9/24/2019 (LAD).
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. ORDERED that Plaintiff serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant and file a notice of service. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 8/15/2019. (LFIG)
August 13, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to United States of America. (DLC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (DLC)
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Micah Schisel. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DLC)
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17272869. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Diane J Humetewa. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-8235-PCT-DJH. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (DLC)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Micah Schisel. (Kille, Mark) (DLC)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17272869 filed by Micah Schisel. (Kille, Mark) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(DLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schisel v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Micah Schisel
Represented By: Mark Anthony Kille
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?