Osornio v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Angel Osornio
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2019cv08267
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2019 Filing 15 REQUEST by Non-Prisoner Pro-Se Party to be Removed from Electronic Noticing by Plaintiff Angel Osornio. (REK)
October 25, 2019 Filing 14 SERVICE EXECUTED: USMS Process Receipt and Return re: Summons, Complaint, and Order upon U.S. Attorney General on 10/15/2019. (REK)
October 22, 2019 Filing 13 SERVICE EXECUTED: Certified Mail Receipt and USMS 285 form returned re: summons, complaint, order upon Commissioner of Social Security Administration on 10/11/19. (SLQ)
October 18, 2019 Filing 12 SERVICE EXECUTED : Certified Mail Receipt re: Summons, Complaint, Order upon United States Attorney, District of Arizona on 10/17/2019. (RMV)
October 4, 2019 Filing 11 REQUEST BY NON-PRISONER PRO SE PARTY FOR ELECTRONIC NOTICING filed by Angel Osornio. Pro se parties must promptly notify the Clerks Office, in writing, if there is a change in designated e-mail address or mailing address. (REK)
September 23, 2019 Filing 9 Prisoner documents received: Three sets of Service Packet Forms for Commissioner of Social Security Administration at 3737 N. 7th St., Ste. 200, Phoenix, AZ 85014-9872. (REK)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER: See document for full details. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 9/18/2019. (REK)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER/NOTICE PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 4(m) directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on December 16, 2019. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 9/18/2019. (REK)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER (Service Packet): The Application for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis #2 , without prepayment of costs or fees or the necessity of giving security therefore is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED granting the Motion for Service by the United States Marshals #3 and the Clerk of Court is directed to send Plaintiff a service packet including this Order, and a copy of the Marshal's Process Receipt & Return form (USM-285) and Notice of Lawsuit & Request for Waiver of Service of Summons form for Defendant(s). Plaintiff must complete and return the service packet to the Clerk of Court within 21 days of the date of filing of this Order. The United States Marshal will not provide service of process if Plaintiff fails to comply with this Order. If Plaintiff does not either obtain a waiver of service of the summons or complete service of the Summons and Complaint on a Defendant within 90 days of the filing of the Complaint or within 60 days of the filing of this Order, whichever is later, the action may be dismissed as to each Defendant not served. See document for further details. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 9/17/2019. (REK)
September 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (RMV)
September 16, 2019 Filing 4 This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge G Murray Snow. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-08267-PCT-GMS. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (RMV)
September 16, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Service by the United States Marshals by Angel Osornio. (1 page) (RMV)
September 16, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Angel Osornio. (5 pages) (RMV)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Angel Osornio. (4 pages) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(RMV)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Osornio v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel Osornio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?