Jim v. Flagstaff Buick GMC Incorporated
Plaintiff: Laverne Jim
Defendant: Flagstaff Buick GMC Incorporated
Case Number: 3:2020cv08031
Filed: February 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Camille D Bibles
Referring Judge: John J Tuchi
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 15:2301
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that this matter will be dismissed with prejudice 60 days after the docketing of this Order unless the parties file a stipulation to dismiss prior to that date. The settlement constitutes an accord that has extinguished the underlying claim. All pending hearings and motions are deemed moot. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 4/6/2020. (JAMA)
April 3, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Settlement of Defendant Flagstaff Buick GMC Inc. by Laverne Jim. (Findsen, Beth)
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED granting Parties' Stipulated Motion to Extend the Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Doc. #13 ), and extending Defendant's time to file an answer in response to the Complaint (Doc. #1 ) 30 days from the date of this order. No further extensions will be granted. (See document for complete details). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 3/5/20. (SLQ)
March 3, 2020 Filing 13 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT re: #1 Complaint (First Request) by Flagstaff Buick GMC Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pursell, Jimmie)
March 3, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Jimmie W Pursell, Jr on behalf of Flagstaff Buick GMC Incorporated. (Pursell, Jimmie)
February 14, 2020 Filing 11 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Laverne Jim: Proof of Service re: Summons Returned Executed upon Flagstaff Buick GMC, Inc. on 02/13/2020. (Findsen, Beth)
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on May 11, 2020. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 2/12/2020. (JAMA)
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that motions to dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) and motions to strike pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) are discouraged if the defect that would be the subject of the motion can be cured by filing an amended pleading. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Order on Defendants. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 2/12/2020. (JAMA)
February 11, 2020 Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge John J Tuchi. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-20-8031-PCT-JJT. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
February 10, 2020 Filing 7 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
February 7, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Flagstaff Buick GMC Incorporated. (MCO). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
February 7, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MCO)
February 7, 2020 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17930026. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Camille D Bibles. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-8031-PCT-CDB. Magistrate Election form attached. (MCO)
February 7, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Laverne Jim. (Findsen, Beth) (MCO)
February 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17930026 filed by Laverne Jim. (Findsen, Beth) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MCO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jim v. Flagstaff Buick GMC Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flagstaff Buick GMC Incorporated
Represented By: Jimmie W Pursell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laverne Jim
Represented By: Beth Findsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?